Original Case: 1:23-cv-01228

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01091
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2024 3:01 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
JASON GOODMAN
Represented By
Jason Goodman
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
21ST CENTURY 3D
Defendant - Appellee
CROWDSOURCE THE TRUTH
Defendant - Appellee
PATREON, INC., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By
Tyler M. Layton
PATREON, INC.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
D. G. SWEIGERT
Represented By
D. G. Sweigert
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/06/2024 2:59 AM CST
Monday, January 22, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 02/05/2024. Docketing Statement due for Appellant D. G. Sweigert by 01/29/2024. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/05/2024 for Appellant D. G. Sweigert. [1] [7360158] 24-1091 (FP) [Entered: 01/23/2024 09:45 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellees 21st Century 3D and Crowdsource The Truth, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [7360173] 24-1091 (FP) [Entered: 01/23/2024 10:09 AM]
Related: [-]