New York Northern District Court
Judge:Glenn T Suddaby
Referred: Therese Wiley Dancks
Case #: 5:24-cv-00116
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Terminated:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Tremaine Wright
Represented By
Aimee Cowan
New York State Attorney General - Syracuse Regional Office
contact info
Defendant
Felicia Reid
Represented By
Aimee Cowan
New York State Attorney General - Syracuse Regional Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Valencia AG, LLC
Represented By
David J. Hoffa
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Joshua P. Thompson
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Robert E. Purcell
Office Of Robert E. Purcell
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Damian Fagon
Terminated: 03/18/2024
Represented By
Aimee Cowan
New York State Attorney General - Syracuse Regional Office
contact info
Defendant
Jessica Garcia
Terminated: 03/18/2024
Represented By
Aimee Cowan
New York State Attorney General - Syracuse Regional Office
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Jenkins
Terminated: 03/18/2024
Represented By
Aimee Cowan
New York State Attorney General - Syracuse Regional Office
contact info
Defendant
New York State Office of Cannabis Management
Terminated: 03/18/2024
Represented By
Aimee Cowan
New York State Attorney General - Syracuse Regional Office
contact info
Defendant
Adam Perry
Terminated: 03/18/2024
Represented By
Aimee Cowan
New York State Attorney General - Syracuse Regional Office
contact info
Defendant
Hope Knight
Terminated: 03/18/2024
Represented By
Aimee Cowan
New York State Attorney General - Syracuse Regional Office
contact info

GPO Mar 25 2025
DECISION AND ORDER that Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) (Dkt. No. 42) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 33) is DISMISSED without prejudice for a lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Glenn T Suddaby on 3/25/2025. (sal)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
62 62 appeal USCA Order Wed 05/21 2:43 PM
ORDER of USCA as to #57 Notice of Appeal: Appellant moves to hold the appeal in abeyance during the pendency of Appellant's provisional licensure process. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Appellant is directed to file stay status update letters in 30-day intervals, beginning 30 days from the date of this order. {Certified Copy Issued on 5/21/2025} (mmg)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 05/21 2:44 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1001 for #57 Notice of Appeal. (mmg)
Related: [-]