Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10110

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John P Mastando III
Case #: 1:24-bk-10111
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Jan 15, 2025

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Anne Holding LLC
587 Beck St
Bronx, NY 10455-3404
Represented By
Mark A. Frankel
Backenroth Frankel & Krinsky, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - Order to Dismiss Fri 01/17 12:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss Related [+] . Notice Date 01/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 01/15 2:18 PM
Case Closed. (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
6 6 order Order, Dismiss Tue 01/14 12:44 PM
Order signed on 1/14/2025 Dismissing Debtor's Chapter 11 Case. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Fri 02/16 2:34 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated Re: Schedules. Schedules filed in Lead Case. (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Sat 02/03 12:14 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 02/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
4 4 order Motion, Joint Administration Wed 01/31 1:50 PM
Order signed on 1/31/2024 Directing Joint Administration Related [+] . (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Wed 01/31 9:21 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/22/2024 at 02:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-]
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Wed 01/31 2:06 PM
Case Joint Administration: An order has been entered in this case, directing the joint administration of this case with the case of Tiffany Holding LLC. All original pleadings shall be captioned and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of Tiffany Holding LLC, Case no. 24-10110 (JPM)(Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
2 2 motion Motion, Joint Administration Tue 01/30 4:01 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Mark A. Frankel on behalf of Anne Holding LLC. (Frankel, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 01/26 4:15 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10111 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16494911. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
Thursday, January 25, 2024
1 1 16 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 01/25 12:20 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 5/24/2024, Disclosure Statement due by 5/24/2024, Initial Case Conference due by 2/26/2024, Filed by Mark A. Frankel of Backenroth Frankel & Krinsky, LLP on behalf of Anne Holding LLC. (Frankel, Mark)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Thu 01/25 12:24 PM
Judge John P. Mastando III added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Thu 01/25 12:28 PM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 2/8/2024. Schedule D due 2/8/2024. Schedule E/F due 2/8/2024. Schedule G due 2/8/2024. Schedule H due 2/8/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 2/8/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors DUE at Time of Filing. Declaration of Schedules due 2/8/2024. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit DUE at Time of Filing. Incomplete Filings due by 2/8/2024, (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]