Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Mark R Hornak
Case #: 2:24-cv-00100
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405(g) Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Mar 25, 2025
Defendant
COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Interested Party
SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Plaintiff
ALTERNA TIMEPEACE
Plaintiff
TONYA BROWN

GPO Mar 25 2025
ORDER denying 15, 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 21 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/25/2025. (dpo)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
38 38 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case Number & Case Manager Assigned) Mon 04/28 2:54 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1815 for37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tonya Brown, ALTERNA TIMEPEACE. USCA Case Manager Stephanie (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (gch3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
37 37 appeal Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Required) Fri 04/25 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to35 Rule 58 Judgment by Tonya Brown, ALTERNA TIMEPEACE. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (ert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
36 36 utility Remark Tue 03/25 11:36 AM
Remark: On this date, copies of the following documents we mailed to each of Ms. Timepeace and Ms. Brown:31 ;32 ;33 ;34 ; and,35 . Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Judgment (Rule 58) Tue 03/25 10:53 AM
JUDGMENT pursuant to Rule 58 entered. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/25/2025. (dpo)
Related: [-]
34 34 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 03/25 10:51 AM
ORDER denying15 ,16 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting21 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/25/2025. (dpo)
Related: [-]
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Tue 03/25 10:27 AM
ORDER denying5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/25/2025. (dpo)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Joinder Tue 03/25 10:26 AM
ORDER denying26 Motion for Joinder of Parties. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/25/2025. (dpo)
Related: [-]
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/25 10:23 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Remove Plaintiff Tonya Brown as a Party to this Action Due to Lack of Standing. TONYA BROWN is dismissed as a party in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/25/2025. (dpo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 10/29 11:04 AM
Pursuant to Administrative Order 2024-13, Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak assigned. Judge Alan N. Bloch no longer assigned to case. (sms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Wed 08/14 6:05 PM
ORDER granting25 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Plaintiffs are permitted to file the documents attached to their motion as Exhibits B and C under seal. Plaintiffs have already filed redacted versions of these documents. Plaintiffs should follow all procedures for filing documents under seal by the Clerk of Court and are required to serve the sealed documents on Defendant using traditional service methods. Documents will be sealed permanently . Signed by Judge Alan N. Bloch on 8/14/2024. (dpo)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
29 29 respm Reply Brief Mon 08/12 9:31 AM
REPLY BRIEF re28 Response in Opposition filed by TONYA BROWN. (ert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
28 28 respoth Response in Opposition Wed 07/24 10:33 AM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to26 Motion for Joinder,27 Objections,25 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal, filed by COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Protano, Evelyn Rose)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
27 27 misc Objections Tue 07/16 12:41 PM
OBJECTIONS to19 Motion to Remove Plaintiff Tonya Brown as a Party to this Action Due to Lack of Standing by TONYA BROWN. (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
26 26 motion Joinder Tue 07/16 12:38 PM
MOTION for Joinder of Parties by TONYA BROWN. (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit D
25 25 motion Leave to File Documents Under Seal Tue 07/16 12:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal or File Redacted Copies of Exhibits B & C. by TONYA BROWN. (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B,
Att: 2 Exhibit C
Monday, June 24, 2024
24 24 respm Response to Motion Tue 06/25 12:27 PM
RESPONSE to21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TONYA BROWN. (ert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Response/Briefing Schedule Tue 06/11 2:41 PM
ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re19 Motion to Remove Plaintiff TONYA BROWN as a Party to this Action Due to Lack of Standing: Plaintiffs' Response to Motion due by 7/12/2024. Failure to file a response will result in Plaintiff TONYA BROWN being dismissed as a party in this matter. Any Reply from Defendant due by 7/26/2024. Signed by Judge Alan N. Bloch on 6/11/2024. (dpo)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
22 22 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 06/10 8:50 AM
BRIEF in Support re21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Protano, Evelyn Rose)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Mon 06/10 8:45 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Protano, Evelyn Rose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 06/10 8:42 AM
BRIEF in Support re19 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Protano, Evelyn Rose)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Mon 06/10 8:34 AM
MOTION to Remove Plaintiff Tonya Brown as a Party to this Action Due to Lack of Standing by COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Protano, Evelyn Rose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/10 8:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Evelyn Rose Marie Protano on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Protano, Evelyn Rose)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
17 17 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support - Other Thu 05/23 11:17 AM
BRIEF in Support of10 Complaint filed by TONYA BROWN. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
16 16 motion Summary Judgment Wed 05/15 1:38 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by TONYA BROWN. (dmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, May 13, 2024
15 15 motion Summary Judgment Wed 05/15 8:31 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment re14 Order by ALTERNA TIMEPEACE. (dmh) (Main Document 15 replaced on 5/15/2024) (dmh). (dmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/15/2024) Exhibit
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
14 14 order Social Security Appeal Order Wed 04/03 4:28 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL ORDER: Notwithstanding Rules 6-8 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and brief due by 5/10/2024. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and brief due by 6/10/2024. Any Reply by Plaintiff due by 6/24/2024. Submitted without hearing on 6/24/2024. No extensions without order of the Court. Signed by Judge Alan N. Bloch on 4/3/2024. (dpo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
13 13 misc Social Security Admin Transcript Wed 03/27 11:06 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings before Social Security Administration by COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. This Transcript constitutes the entirety of the Answer to the Complaint by the Social Security Administration. (Montgomery, Delores)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 2 pp. 1-56,
Att: 3 pp. 57-81,
Att: 4 pp. 82-281,
Att: 5 pp. 282-297,
Att: 6 pp. 298-380,
Att: 7 pp. 381-402
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/20 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Delores Montgomery on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Montgomery, Delores)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
11 11 service Summons Issued Wed 02/07 12:52 PM
Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (njd)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 02/07 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, filed by ALTERNA TIMEPEACE, TONYA BROWN. (njd)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 02/07 2:58 PM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION on 4/8/2024 (njd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/06 1:58 PM
ORDER denying as moot1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Alan N. Bloch on 2/6/2024. (dpo)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/06 1:27 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Obtain Service of Process Without Prepayment of Fees. Pursuant to Supplemental Rule 3 for Social Security Actions, Plaintiff is not required to effect service; instead, the Court will notify the Commissioner of Social Security of the commencement of this action. Signed by Judge Alan N. Bloch on 2/6/2024. (dpo)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/06 1:15 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ALTERNA TIMEPEACE. The Clerk is directed to file the complaint attached to said motion. Signed by Judge Alan N. Bloch on 2/6/2024. (dpo)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
6 6 order Order Reassigning Case Mon 01/29 11:56 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan N. Bloch for all further proceedings. Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 1/29/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjw)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 01/29 12:09 PM
Judge Alan N. Bloch added. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
5 5 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 01/26 10:35 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by TONYA BROWN, ALTERNA TIMEPEACE. (dmh)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Fri 01/26 10:31 AM
MOTION to Obtain Service of Process Without Prepayment of Fees by TONYA BROWN, ALTERNA TIMEPEACE. (dmh)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Fri 01/26 10:17 AM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by COMMISSIONER, OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (dmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/26 10:12 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALTERNA TIMEPEACE. (dmh) (dmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 3 (1/26/2024) Summons
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/26 10:11 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TONYA BROWN. (dmh) (dmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 3 (1/26/2024) Summons