GAC, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10118
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10118
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10120 |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50,001-100,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
GAC, Inc.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Tue 01/30 12:57 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
||
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Signed on 1/29/2024 (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases And (II) Granting Related Relief . All further pleadings and other papers in such cases shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in GOL Linhas Areas Inteligentes S.A., Case No. 24-10118 (MG). (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Mon 01/29 2:25 PM
Case Joint Administration. All further pleadings and other papers in such cases shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in GOL Linhas Areas Inteligentes S.A., Case No. 24-10118 (MG). (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases And (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Fleck, Evan (Fleck, Evan) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Case Designated As Mega as per LBR 1073-1. Filed by Evan R. Fleck of Milbank LLP on behalf of GAC, Inc.. (Fleck, Evan) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Thu 01/25 3:18 PM
Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 01/25 4:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10120 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B16492979. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |