Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10118

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:24-bk-10122
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Gol Finance (Cayman)

,
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
misc Add Claims and Noticing Agent Tue 01/30 12:58 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
3 3 order Motion, Joint Administration Mon 01/29 9:39 AM
Order Signed on 1/29/2024 (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases And (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. All further pleadings and other papers in such cases shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in GOL Linhas Areas Inteligentes S.A., Case No. 24-10118 (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 2
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Mon 01/29 3:12 PM
Case Joint Administration. All further pleadings and other papers in such cases shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in GOL Linhas Areas Inteligentes S.A., Case No. 24-10118 (MG). (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
2 2 motion Motion, Joint Administration (batch) (one PDF) Thu 01/25 4:59 PM
Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases And (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Fleck, Evan (Fleck, Evan)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 01/25 3:25 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Case Designated As Mega as per LBR 1073-1. Filed by Evan R. Fleck of Milbank LLP on behalf of Gol Finance (Cayman). (Fleck, Evan)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Thu 01/25 3:29 PM
Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 01/25 4:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10122 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B16492979. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1