New York Northern District Court
Judge:Mae A D'Agostino
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 8:24-cv-00121
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 American Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Kenneth Cardarelli
Defendant
Paymaster Payroll Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Joseph Pompo
Plaintiff
Scott Phillip Lewis
1936 Saranac Ave #3, PMB 411
Lake Placid, NY 12946

GPO Feb 29 2024
REPORT-RECOMMENDATION: It is hereby RECOMMENDED, that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED with leave to amend. (Objections to R&R due by 3/14/2024 Case Review Deadline 3/18/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on February 29, 2024. (Copy served via regular mail)(ztc)
GPO Apr 09 2024
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 7 Report and Recommendations: The Court hereby ORDERS that Magistrate Judge Stewart's Report-Recommendation and Order (Dkt. No. 7) is ADOPTED in its entirety for the reasons set forth herein; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close this case; ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff in accordance with Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 04/09/2024. (Copy served via regular and certified mail upon plaintiff)(ban)
GPO Apr 09 2024
JUDGMENT in favor of Paymaster Payroll Systems, Inc., Joseph Pompo, Kenneth Cardarelli against Scott Phillip Lewis. (Copy served via regular and certified mail upon plaintiff) (Attachments: # (1) Appeal Notice) (ban)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/04 8:32 AM
USCA Case Number 24-1256 for12 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Phillip Lewis. (nas )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
16 16 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 03/28 4:15 PM
MANDATE of USCA: it is hereby ordered, adjudged and decreed that the appeal is DISMISSED for lack of appellate jurisdiction. (lmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
15 15 order Order on Pro Se Motion for Permission to File Electronically in ECF Fri 09/27 6:59 AM
TEXT ORDER. The Complaint in this action has been dismissed and the case marked closed. The Motion, therefore, is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/27/2024. (gjr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
14 14 motion Pro Se Motion for Permission to File Electronically in ECF Thu 09/19 11:11 AM
Pro Se MOTION for Permission to File Electronically in ECF filed by Scott Phillip Lewis. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. {Filed via MFT on 9/18/2024}(ztc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
13 13 appeal Electronic Notice and Certification to USCA of Appeal Wed 05/01 4:51 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION sent to US Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal (mmg)
Related: [-]
12 12 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 05/01 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Judgment by Scott Phillip Lewis, Filed Via MFT. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
11 11 misc Return Receipt Wed 04/17 12:41 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT returned executed as to Scott Phillip Lewis re the #10 Judgment. (kck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
10 10 order Judgment Tue 04/09 10:32 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Paymaster Payroll Systems, Inc., Joseph Pompo, Kenneth Cardarelli against Scott Phillip Lewis. (Copy served via regular and certified mail upon plaintiff) (ban)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Notice
9 9 9 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 04/09 10:22 PM
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re7 Report and Recommendations: The Court hereby ORDERS that Magistrate Judge Stewart's Report-Recommendation and Order (Dkt. No. 7) is ADOPTED in its entirety for the reasons set forth herein; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close this case; ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff in accordance with Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 04/09/2024. (Copy served via regular and certified mail upon plaintiff)(ban)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
8 8 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Thu 03/07 12:24 PM
OBJECTIONS to7 REPORT-RECOMMENDATION filed by Scott Phillip Lewis. {Filed via MFT on 3/6/2024} (ztc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
7 7 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 02/29 10:27 AM
REPORT-RECOMMENDATION: It is hereby RECOMMENDED, that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED with leave to amend. (Objections to R&R due by 3/14/2024 Case Review Deadline 3/18/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on February 29, 2024. (Copy served via regular mail)(ztc)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/29 10:12 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on February 29, 2024. (Copy served via Regular Mail) (ztc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
5 5 misc Pro Se Handbook and Notice Issued Tue 01/30 4:23 PM
PRO SE NOTICE signed by Scott Phillip Lewis. {Filed via MFT on 1/30/2024} (ztc)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 01/30 4:22 PM
Clerk attached the Proposed Summonses and Proposed USM 285 Forms for all Defendants filed by Pro Se Plaintiff via MFT on 1/30/2024 to Docket #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ztc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
4 4 notice Notice Regarding Judge D'Agostino Case Disposition Pilot (Text-Only) Thu 01/25 4:50 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf . (Copy served via Regular Mail) (ztc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pro Se Handbook and Notice Issued Thu 01/25 4:48 PM
PRO SE NOTICE issued to Scott Phillip Lewis via Regular Mail. (Pro Se called the Clerk's Office stating he has copies of 2024 Local Rules and Pro Se Handbook from filing previous cases) (ztc)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/25 4:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Scott Phillip Lewis. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. {Filed via MFT on January 25, 2024} (ztc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/25 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Kenneth Cardarelli, Paymaster Payroll Systems, Inc., Joseph Pompo filed by Scott Phillip Lewis. {Filed via MFT on January 25, 2024}(ztc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet