North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Kenneth D Bell
Referred: Susan C Rodriguez
Case #: 3:24-cv-00092
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
CauseDiversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 4:44 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
FFF Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas M. Melsheimer
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeffrey S. Wilkerson
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Thomas B. Walsh, IV
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
E. Danielle T. Williams
Winston & Strawn/chicago
contact info
Matthew J. Wurst
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Chase J. Cooper
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.
Represented By
J. Mark Wilson
Moore & Van Allen PLLC
contact info
Defendant
FFF Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas M. Melsheimer
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeffrey S. Wilkerson
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Thomas B. Walsh, IV
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
E. Danielle T. Williams
Winston & Strawn/chicago
contact info
Matthew J. Wurst
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Chase J. Cooper
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.
Represented By
J. Mark Wilson
Moore & Van Allen PLLC
contact info
Rebecca E. Alba
Moore & Van Allen PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/05 9:09 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P. (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Wilson, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/21 9:12 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Stayed End Deadline 3/24/2025. (mek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
28 28 motion Stay Thu 02/20 4:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.. Responses due by 3/6/2025 (Alba, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 02/20 5:05 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 28 Motion to Stay. The parties report that they have executed a settlement agreement and prepared a dismissal. However, the settlement agreement includes terms that must be satisfied before the dismissal can be filed. The stay in this matter is extended through March 24, 2025. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 2/20/2025. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/21 9:27 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Stayed End Deadline 2/20/2025. (mek)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 19, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Sun 01/19 12:32 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 27 Motion to Stay. The stay in this matter is extended through February 20, 2025 while the parties finalize written settlement documents. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 1/19/2025. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
27 27 motion Stay Fri 01/17 6:58 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by FFF Enterprises, Inc.. Responses due by 1/31/2025 (Wilkerson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 23, 2024
26 26 misc Status Report Mon 12/23 9:36 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P. (Wilson, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 11/22 1:37 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 25 Motion to Stay Deadlines. The parties report they have reached agreement to resolve all claims and counterclaims between them and request a 60 day stay of deadlines while they finalize written settlement documents. All deadlines are stayed 60 days through January 21, 2025. The parties will file a status report 30 days from this Order, and another status report 30 days thereafter unless they first file a stipulation of dismissal. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 11/22/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
25 25 motion Stay Thu 11/21 5:08 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.. Responses due by 12/5/2024 (Wilson, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 10, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Ziemowit Zambrzycki on behalf of Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P. (Zambrzycki, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
23 23 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 09/17 1:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Matthew Wurst by FFF Enterprises, Inc.. Responses due by 10/1/2024 (Wilkerson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 09/17 2:13 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 23 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew J. Wurst terminated. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 9/17/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/19 12:09 PM
ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Chase J. Cooper for FFF Enterprises, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 7/19/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Fri 07/19 12:11 PM
Notice to Chase J. Cooper: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 7/26/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Thu 07/18 5:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chase J. Cooper Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6596649. by FFF Enterprises, Inc.. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
20 20 adr Designation of Mediator Tue 07/02 12:51 PM
DESIGNATION of Jonathan E. Buchan as Mediator by all the parties. (Alba, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/02 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca E. Alba on behalf of Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P. (Alba, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
18 18 order Protective Order Mon 06/24 2:23 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 6/24/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
17 17 motion Protective Order Fri 06/21 5:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.. Responses due by 7/5/2024 (Wilson, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/08 5:28 PM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: three to five days. Mediator Designation deadline set for 7/7/2024. Mediation deadline set for 1/8/2025. Discovery due by 1/8/2025. Motions due by 2/8/2025. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 5/8/2024. (mek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
15 15 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Tue 05/07 5:43 PM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Wilson, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Tue 04/16 9:19 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 5/7/2024. (mek)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 04/15 5:29 PM
ANSWER to9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P..(Wilson, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/26 8:52 AM
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Thomas M. Melsheimer for FFF Enterprises, Inc.(Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF); granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Thomas B. Walsh, IV for FFF Enterprises, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF); granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew J. Wurst for FFF Enterprises, Inc.(Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 03/26/2024. (cjs)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Tue 03/26 8:54 AM
Notice to Thomas M. Melsheimer: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 4/2/2024. (cjs)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Tue 03/26 8:55 AM
Notice to Thomas B. Walsh, IV: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 4/2/2024. (cjs)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Tue 03/26 8:56 AM
Notice to Matthew J. Wurst: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 4/2/2024. (cjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Mon 03/25 7:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew J. Wurst Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6455061. by FFF Enterprises, Inc.. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Mon 03/25 7:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas B. Walsh, IV Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6455059. by FFF Enterprises, Inc.. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Mon 03/25 7:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas M. Melsheimer Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6455058. by FFF Enterprises, Inc.. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 03/25 7:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P. by FFF Enterprises, Inc..(Wilkerson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Counsel Mon 03/25 7:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel - Settlement Conference by Jeffrey S. Wilkerson on behalf of FFF Enterprises, Inc. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/25 6:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by FFF Enterprises, Inc.. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/25 6:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Wilkerson on behalf of FFF Enterprises, Inc. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/16 8:03 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint. FFF Enterprises, Inc.'s answer due 3/25/2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 2/16/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/15 10:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint or to Otherwise Respond by FFF Enterprises, Inc.. (Williams, E. Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/06 5:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.. FFF Enterprises, Inc. served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024. (Wilson, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/26 8:42 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to FFF Enterprises, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (mdp)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Bell Civil Standing Order Requiring ISC Fri 01/26 8:38 AM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases] assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (mdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/25 4:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P.. (Wilson, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/25 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT against FFF Enterprises, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6380000), filed by Premier Healthcare Alliance, L.P..(Wilson, J.)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/26 8:37 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (mdp)
Related: [-]