Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:24-cv-00045
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Mar 14, 2024
Case in other court:71st Judicial District Court, Harrison County, 23-01287
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Northfield Insurance Company
Represented By
James W Holbrook, III
Zelle LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Birdies In The Pines, LLC
Represented By
D Scott Carlile
Carlile Law Firm
contact info
David Cornelius Carlile
David C. Carlile, Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, March 14, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Thu 03/14 4:21 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Remand to the 71st Judicial District Court of Harrison County, Texas.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/14/2024. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
7 7 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/07 2:15 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION to Remand filed by Northfield Insurance Company . (Holbrook, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
6 6 motion Remand Wed 02/21 11:03 AM
MOTION to Remand by Birdies In The Pines, LLC.(Carlile, D)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of David C. Carlile,
Att: 2 Exhibit Excerpts from Insurance Contract,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 02/20 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D Scott Carlile on behalf of Birdies In The Pines, LLC (Carlile, D)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Tue 02/20 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2024 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/20/2024. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/25 4:21 PM
***ORIGINAL ANSWER FILED IN HARRISON CO.*** ANSWER to2 Complaint by Northfield Insurance Company. (CAUSE NO. 23-1287 (ch, )
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 01/25 4:19 PM
***ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FILED IN HARRISON CO. *** COMPLAINT against Northfield Insurance Company, filed by Birdies In The Pines, LLC. (CAUSE NO. 23-1287 (ch, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 01/25 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Northfield Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-9941146), filed by Northfield Insurance Company.(Holbrook, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - List of Parties,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Original Petition,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Defendant's Original Answer,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - List of Attorneys,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Trial by Jury Requests,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - State Court Information,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - PIR (2023)
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/25 4:12 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Thu 01/25 4:13 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]