California Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referred: Daniel E Butcher
Case #: 3:24-cv-00172
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441oc Removal- Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court, San Diego County, 37-02023-00055108-CU-MC-CTL
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1 through 100
Defendant
The Vanguard Group, Inc.
Represented By
David Ramraj Singh
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Blake J Steinberg
contact info
Blake Jacob Steinberg
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Amy Tu Quyen Le
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
David Yohai
Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aidan Lardizabal
Represented By
Min "Emily&quo Yuqing
contact info
Thomas Anthony Leary
Law Offices Of Thomas Leary, Apc
contact info
John R Ternieden
contact info
Andrew Daniel Bluth
Singleton Schreiber, LLP
contact info
Christopher Ross Rodriguez
Singleton Schreiber, LLP
contact info
Trent James Nelson
Singleton Schreiber
contact info
John Richard Ternieden
Singleton Schreiber LLP
contact info
Trent J Nelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Mayra Alejandra Puentes
Represented By
Min "Emily&quo Yuqing
contact info
Thomas Anthony Leary
Law Offices Of Thomas Leary, Apc
contact info
John R Ternieden
contact info
Andrew Daniel Bluth
Singleton Schreiber, LLP
contact info
Christopher Ross Rodriguez
Singleton Schreiber, LLP
contact info
Trent James Nelson
Singleton Schreiber
contact info
John Richard Ternieden
Singleton Schreiber LLP
contact info
Trent J Nelson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
23 23 misc Transfer Letter Received Tue 04/16 2:10 PM
Transfer Letter Received from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case number in other court is 2:24cv01577 (jpp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
22 22 order Case Transferred Out - District FORM Mon 04/15 3:51 PM
Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Pensylvania. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of Pensylvania*.*601 Market Street**Philadelphia, PA 19106*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/15/2024. (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transfer Order
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/26 2:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Singh, David) (anh)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/26 2:43 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 filed by The Vanguard Group, Inc..(Singh, David) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Evan Stanley
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 03/12 2:07 PM
ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion for Extension of time [Doc. No.18 ].. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/12/2024. (anh)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 03/12 10:37 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Replies to Plaintiffs' Oppositions to the Motion to Dismiss and the Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by The Vanguard Group, Inc..(Singh, David) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David R. Singh,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 08, 2024
17 17 motion Appear Fri 03/08 7:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Request Oral Argument by Aidan Lardizabal, Mayra Alejandra Puentes. (Rodriguez, Christopher)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/08 7:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 filed by Aidan Lardizabal, Mayra Alejandra Puentes.(Rodriguez, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
15 15 motion Appear Fri 03/08 7:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Request Oral Argument by Aidan Lardizabal, Mayra Alejandra Puentes. (Rodriguez, Christopher)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/08 7:17 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aidan Lardizabal, Mayra Alejandra Puentes.(Rodriguez, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Friday, February 16, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/16 4:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Singh, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Change Venue Fri 02/16 4:28 PM
MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 by The Vanguard Group, Inc..(Singh, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Evan Stanley,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - E
Monday, January 29, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 01/29 12:47 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. No.9 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/29/2024. (anh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 01/26 3:18 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of David Yohai Related [+]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/26/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
Related: [-] ECF No.6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 01/26 3:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Singh, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 01/26 3:15 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Blake J. Steinberg Related [+]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/26/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
Related: [-] ECF No.7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
7 7 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/26 2:15 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-18535894.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Steinberg, Blake)(jrd)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/26 2:10 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-18535812.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Yohai, David)(jrd)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order of Judge Transfer Fri 01/26 11:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24-cv-0172-CAB-DEB.(no document attached) (dim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
4 4 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/25 2:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Vanguard Group, Inc. re2 Notice of Party With Financial Interest,3 Corporate Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Singh, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/25 2:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Vanguard Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group of Investment Companies for The Vanguard Group, Inc... (Singh, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Thu 01/25 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by The Vanguard Group, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group of Investment Companies, Other Affiliate Aidan Lardizabal, Other Affiliate Mayra Alejandra Puentes for The Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Singh, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 01/25 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18530686.), filed by The Vanguard Group, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-172-BTM-DEB. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(stn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 13 pgs Exhibit A - State Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B