Main Sequence, Ltd. et al v. Dudesy, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00711 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 8:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Chad Kultgen
|
|
Defendant
Dudesy, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Will Sasso
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Jerold Hamza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Main Sequence, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Judgment Permanent Injunction
Tue 04/02 1:54 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Consent Judgment, Joint STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza, Main Sequence, Ltd..(Schiller, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Proposed Permanent Injunction) | ||
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 03/06 10:47 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lfa) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Thu 02/08 8:32 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza, Main Sequence, Ltd..(Schiller, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 02/05 5:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Main Sequence, Ltd., Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza. upon Dudesy, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Chad Kultgen. (Schiller, Joshua) |
|
18 | 18
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 02/05 5:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Main Sequence, Ltd., Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza. upon Chad Kultgen waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Chad Kultgen. (Schiller, Joshua) |
|
17 | 17
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 02/05 4:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Main Sequence, Ltd., Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza. upon Will Sasso waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. Waiver of Service signed by William Sasso. (Schiller, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/01 3:56 PM
ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: granting13 Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Cassier APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza, Main Sequence, Ltd., designating Joshua Schiller as local counsel. (yl) |
|
15 | 15
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/01 3:52 PM
ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: granting12 Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin Margulis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza, Main Sequence, Ltd., designating Joshua Schiller as local counsel. (yl) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 01/31 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza, Main Sequence, Ltd., identifying Kelly Carlin. (Schiller, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 01/30 10:20 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Cassirer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza, Main Sequence, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36818644) filed by Plaintiffs Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza, Main Sequence, Ltd.. (Schiller, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 01/30 10:15 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin Margulis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza, Main Sequence, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36818534) filed by Plaintiffs Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza, Main Sequence, Ltd.. (Schiller, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Tue 01/30 9:45 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L. Cassirer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) |
|
10 | 10
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Tue 01/30 9:43 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin Margulis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Mon 01/29 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form
Mon 01/29 4:50 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 01/29 4:45 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Chad Kultgen, Dudesy, LLC, and Will Sasso. (jtil) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 01/26 4:46 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 01/26 4:45 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 01/26 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Thu 01/25 5:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza as executor for the Estate of George Carlin, Main Sequence, Ltd.. (Schiller, Joshua) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 01/25 5:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jerold Hamza, Jerold Hamza as executor for the Estate of George Carlin, Main Sequence, Ltd.. (Schiller, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 01/25 5:28 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36798068 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Main Sequence, Ltd., Jerold Hamza as executor for the Estate of George Carlin, Jerold Hamza. (Attorney Joshua I. Schiller added to party Jerold Hamza(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua I. Schiller added to party Jerold Hamza as executor for the Estate of George Carlin(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua I. Schiller added to party Main Sequence, Ltd.(pty:pla))(Schiller, Joshua) |