New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:24-bk-40335
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Mar 01, 2024
Dismissed:May 10, 2024
Terminated:May 28, 2024

Debtor
223 15TH ST LLC
223 15th St
Brooklyn, NY 11215-4901
Represented By
Ehsanul Habib
Law Office Of Ehsanul Habib
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Lori Lapin Jones
Lori Lapin Jones PLLC 98 Cutter Mill Road Suite 255 South
Great Neck, NY 11021
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 01/26/2024 12:04 AM EST
Thursday, January 25, 2024
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Thu 01/25 1:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1 24-40335 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22322761. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Prior Filings Thu 01/25 4:04 PM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 23-41566 nhl dismissed: 10/23/2023 (nop)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Reassignment Utility Thu 01/25 4:04 PM
Judge Jil Mazer-Marino removed from the case due to Prior Filing, Judge Reassigned. Judge Nancy Hershey Lord added to the case. (nop)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 01/25 1:04 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Ehsanul Habib on behalf of 223 15TH ST LLC (Habib, Ehsanul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Thu 01/25 1:05 PM
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Filed by Ehsanul Habib on behalf of 223 15TH ST LLC (Habib, Ehsanul)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign) Thu 01/25 2:00 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Jones, Lori Lapin, with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 3/1/2024 at 10:30 AM at Zoom.us/join - Jones: Meeting ID 215 709 1137, Passcode 7820099907, Phone 1 (516)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Deficient Filing Chapter 7 Thu 01/25 4:08 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 1/25/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 1/25/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 2/8/2024. (nop)
Related: [-]