Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Referred: Panayotta D Augustin-Birch
Case #: 0:24-cv-60140
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By
Kristen Dana Perkins
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info
Jordan H. Lewis
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info
Mediator
Lewis Jack
Plaintiff
SLB Acquisitions Florida LLC
Represented By
Joseph William Lawrence, II
Vezina Lawrence & Piscitelli
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, January 03, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 01/03 11:15 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Case is closed. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/3/2025. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Mon 12/16 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by SLB Acquisitions Florida LLC (Lawrence, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/25 7:59 PM
Amended NOTICE of Mediation and Notice of Compliance with Paperless Order [DE 32] by Evanston Insurance Company (Perkins, Kristen)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/25 2:05 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting31 Motion to Conduct Mediation Remotely. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/25/2024. (kv00)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/22 6:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Conduct Mediation Remotely re15 Order Referring Case to Mediation by Evanston Insurance Company.(Lewis, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 18, 2024
30 30 trial Witness List Mon 11/18 6:58 PM
Witness List by Evanston Insurance Company.. (Perkins, Kristen)
Related: [-]
29 29 trial Witness List Mon 11/18 4:30 PM
Witness List by SLB Acquisitions Florida LLC.. (Lawrence, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
28 28 trial Witness List Mon 10/07 4:45 PM
Witness List Expert Witness Disclosure by SLB Acquisitions Florida LLC.. (Lawrence, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
27 27 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 08/13 9:22 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address and email information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Joseph William Lawrence, II re25 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name (pt)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 08/13 8:48 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney(s) Joseph William Lawrence, II re25 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Joseph William Lawrence, II has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in any pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions.[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information] (pt)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Mon 08/12 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; by Joseph William Lawrence, II (Lawrence, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 04/10 3:31 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Lewis Jack. Mediation Hearing set for 12/3/2024 01:00 PM Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 04/10 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Compliance and Amended Notice of Scheduling Mediation by Evanston Insurance Company re 22 Order Striking, (Lewis, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
22 22 order Order Striking Mon 04/08 4:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING21 Notice of Scheduling Mediation for failure to comply with15 Order of Referral to Mediation. The Order states in pertinent part, "Appearance shall be in person ; telephonic and videoconference appearance is prohibited. " The parties shall file a Notice complaint with this Court's Order by April 10, 2024 . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/8/2024. (lfa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/05 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Scheduling Mediation by Evanston Insurance Company re15 Order Referring Case to Mediation,14 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, (Lewis, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/02 3:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to17 Memorandum filed by Evanston Insurance Company.(Perkins, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Pgs 1-65,
Att: 2 Exhibit Pgs 66-120,
Att: 3 Exhibit Pgs 121-146,
Att: 4 Exhibit Pgs 147-172
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 03/26 5:04 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant shall file a Reply by April 2, 2024 . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/26/2024. (lfa)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 03/25 1:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to17 Memorandum by Evanston Insurance Company. (Perkins, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
17 17 18 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 03/19 3:55 PM
MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by SLB Acquisitions Florida LLC. (Lawrence, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
16 16 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 03/01 3:51 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 3/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 03/01 2:38 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 1/13/2025. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/01 2:37 PM
ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 6/2/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 5/27/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2024., Expert Discovery due by 12/16/2024., Fact Discovery due by 12/16/2024., Joinder of Parties due by 3/29/2024., Mediation Deadline 1/13/2025., In Limine Motions due by 5/5/2025., Dispositive Motions due by 2/3/2025., Motions due by 5/5/2025., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/5/2025.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/29 5:02 PM
NOTICE Certificate of Interested Parties by SLB Acquisitions Florida LLC (Lawrence, Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 02/29 4:58 PM
Joint Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by SLB Acquisitions Florida LLC (Lawrence, Joseph)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Initial Disclosure(s) Thu 02/29 4:56 PM
Initial Disclosure(s) Rule 26(A)(1) by SLB Acquisitions Florida LLC (Lawrence, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Thu 02/29 4:50 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by SLB Acquisitions Florida LLC (Lawrence, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/29 3:53 PM
NOTICE Certificate of Interested Parties by Evanston Insurance Company re5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Perkins, Kristen)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Thu 02/29 3:46 PM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Evanston Insurance Company (Perkins, Kristen)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Initial Disclosure(s) Thu 02/29 3:44 PM
Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evanston Insurance Company (Perkins, Kristen)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/29 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Pending Motion by Evanston Insurance Company (Perkins, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DE 1-2,
Att: 2 Exhibit DE 1-3,
Att: 3 Exhibit DE 1-4
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
5 5 8 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 02/13 10:53 AM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/29/2024 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 2/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Mon 02/12 4:53 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL Pursuant to February 7, 2023 Order [DE 3] against SLB Acquisitions Florida LLC, filed by Evanston Insurance Company.(Perkins, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
3 3 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/07 9:30 AM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that by February 12, 2024, Defendant shall file an amended notice of removal that clarifies its citizenship by identifying each of Quality Builders LLCs members and their citizenships. Failure to do so will result in remand of this action without further notice. (Amended Notice of Removal due by 2/12/2024.) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 2/6/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 01/26 10:37 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Thu 01/25 7:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17243010, filed by Evanston Insurance Company.(Perkins, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Docs 1-10,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh 1 - Doc 11.1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh 1 - Doc 11.2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh 1 - Doc 11.3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh 1 - Docs 12-16,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh 1 - Doc 17.1,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh 1 - Doc 17.2,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh 1 - Doc 17.3,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exh 1 - Doc 18-19,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exh 2,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exh 3,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exh 4