Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Referred: Regina D Cannon
Case #: 1:24-cv-00347
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Office Depot
Represented By
Rocio Blanco Garcia
Littler Mendelson, P.C. -Fl
contact info
Nichole Chang Novosel
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Black Rock LLC
Defendant
ODP Investment, LLC
Defendant
Office Depot LLC
Represented By
Nichole Chang Novosel
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Office Max LLC
Plaintiff
Joseph M. Bonelli
2219 Hampton Trial SE
Conyers, GA 30013
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Office Depot Conyers
Terminated: 05/09/2024
Represented By
Rocio Blanco Garcia
Littler Mendelson, P.C. -Fl
contact info
Nichole Chang Novosel
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Office Depot Corporate
Terminated: 05/09/2024
Represented By
Rocio Blanco Garcia
Littler Mendelson, P.C. -Fl
contact info
Nichole Chang Novosel
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Friday, February 21, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 02/21 2:29 PM
Submission of30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
30 30 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/02 1:52 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Office Depot LLC.(Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Friday, November 15, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/15 9:51 AM
ORDER granting28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re26 Amended Complaint, Defendants' Answers due 12/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 11/15/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/15 9:56 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph M. Bonelli re29 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Thu 11/14 5:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re26 Amended Complaint, with Brief In Support by Office Depot, Office Depot LLC.(Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 07, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 11/07 12:06 PM
ORDER ADOPTING the24 Report and Recommendation. Defendants shall have fourteen days from the date of this Order to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint26 . Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/06/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/07 12:09 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph M. Bonelli re27 Order. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
26 26 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/31 12:37 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joseph M. Bonelli.(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text to reflect second amended complaint on 10/31/2024 (rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Tue 10/08 1:35 PM
ORDER for Service of24 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 10/08/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 10/08 1:34 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss13 be granted. Because Plaintiff is proceeding pro se and a more carefully drafted complaint could state several plausible claims, Plaintiff should be given ONE opportunity to amend his complaint and replead those claims that are dismissed without prejudice within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS after entry of an Order addressing this report Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 10/08/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 10/08 1:36 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph M. Bonelli re25 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,24 Report and Recommendation. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
23 23 misc Letter Wed 08/28 10:13 AM
Letter from Joseph M. Bonelli. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 06/11 11:45 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Stay all pretrial deadlines and discovery in this case until its pending motion to dismiss is resolved. The undersigned will enter a recommendation regarding the motion to dismiss in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 6/11/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 06/11 11:59 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph M. Bonelli re22 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 06/10 1:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Office Depot LLC.(Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 31, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/31 11:46 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Office Depot LLC. (Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/23 2:32 PM
Submission of13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (pdw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/22 10:14 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Defendants must file their motion-to-dismiss reply, as applicable, and respond to Plaintiffs amended complaint by May 31, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 5/22/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/22 10:16 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph M. Bonelli re19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/21 6:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Reply In Support Of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Office Depot, Office Depot LLC.(Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 10, 2024
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/10 4:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joseph M. Bonelli. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/10 9:57 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Office Depot LLC, Office Depot, ODP Investment, LLC, Office Max LLC, and Black Rock LLC, filed by Joseph M. Bonelli.(rsg)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Response (Non-Motion) Fri 05/10 9:52 AM
RESPONSE re14 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Joseph M. Bonelli.(rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, April 29, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/29 1:33 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Office Depot, Office Depot Conyers, Office Depot Corporate identifying Corporate Parent ODP Investment, LLC for Office Depot, Office Depot Conyers, Office Depot Corporate. (Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/29 11:41 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Office Depot, Office Depot Conyers, Office Depot Corporate.(Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Friday, April 05, 2024
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 04/05 9:41 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:12 APPLICATION for Admission of Rocio Blanco Garcia Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13339722). Attorney Rocio Blanco Garcia added appearing on behalf of Office Depot, Office Depot Conyers, Office Depot Corporate. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/05 11:22 AM
DOCKET ORDER granting12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rocio Blanco Garcia. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/05/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
12 12 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 12:11 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Rocio Blanco Garcia Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13339722). with Brief In Support by Office Depot, Office Depot Conyers, Office Depot Corporate. (Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/04 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nichole Chang Novosel on behalf of Office Depot, Office Depot Conyers, Office Depot Corporate (Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/02 12:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Office Depot Conyers, Office Depot Corporate, Office Depot. All Defendants. (Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
8 8 service Request for Waiver of Service Wed 02/28 3:03 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Office Depot on 2/28/2024. If waiver not returned by 4/3/2024, prepare personal service package.(rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/28 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Copy of Order by Joseph M. Bonelli. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
9 9 utility Remark Thu 02/29 9:09 AM
Received summonses and USM285 forms for Defendant Office Depot, Defendant Office Depot Corporate, Defendant Office Depot Conyers. (rsg) Modified on 2/29/2024 No 285 form with summons for Office Depot Conyers, Attn: Annette Dixon (rsg)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 02/28 1:54 PM
Initial Disclosures by Joseph M. Bonelli.(rsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
5 5 cmp Complaint Fri 02/09 9:43 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Joseph M. Bonelli.(ddm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
4 4 order Notice to Pro Se Parties Fri 02/09 9:42 AM
NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 02/09/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order ruling on IFP Fri 02/09 9:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING1 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the USM 285 form, summons form, and the initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is to complete these forms and return them to the Clerk of Court within 21 days from the entry date of this Order. Upon receipt of the completed forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is to prepare service waiver packages. If a Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within 35 days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service a service package. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 02/09/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/09 9:44 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph M. Bonelli re [3,4] Orders, USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
2 2 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 02/06 3:36 PM
ORDER DECLINING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-00347-SCJ-RDC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/6/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 02/06 3:38 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph M. Bonelli re2 Order Declining Case,. (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/06 3:38 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 01/25 10:21 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/25 10:19 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph M. Bonelli. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet