New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:24-cv-00441
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
PARAGON PRIVATE HEALTH, LLC
Represented By
TYLER BAKER
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
SIGNATURE MD, INC.
Represented By
TYLER BAKER
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Notice Only
PHV PHILLIP A. BOCK
Notice Only
PHV DAVID M. OPPENHEIM
Notice Only
JAY RAMSEY
Plaintiff
ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A.
Represented By
MATTHEW NICHOLAS FIOROVANTI
Giordano Halleran & Ciesla PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
44 44 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/30 2:31 PM
TEXT ORDER: A status conference via telephone is set for June 2, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 4/30/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 04/30 2:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
43 43 order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Tue 02/25 1:42 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon a review of the docket and status of this matter. In light of the Stipulation and Order of Dismissal as to Signature MD, Inc. (Doc. No.42 ), the Clerk of the Court shall TERMINATE the Motion for Summary Judgment pending at Docket Entry Number31 as Moot. In light of the parties' ongoing discussions (see Doc. No.40 ), the Clerk of the Court shall TERMINATE the Motions for the Issuance of Letters Rogatory pending at Docket Entry Numbers21 and22 . Plaintiff may renew its request for the Issuance of Letters Rogatory, if and when necessary.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 2/25/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
42 42 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 02/19 9:05 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice as to SIGNATURE MD, INC. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/18/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
41 41 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 02/13 2:24 PM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the discovery deadlines in this matter are hereby held in abeyance pending further order of the Court. A status conference via telephone is set for April 30, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. No later than three (3) business days prior to the telephone status conference, the parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF not to exceed three (3) pages, setting forth the status of discovery and identifying any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 2/13/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 02/13 2:19 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 2/13/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
40 40 misc Status Report Wed 02/12 4:16 PM
STATUS REPORT Jointly with Defendant Paragon Private Health, LLC by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A.. (FIOROVANTI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 02/12 3:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Signature MD, Inc. by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A.. (FIOROVANTI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
38 38 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/11 8:52 AM
ORDER Extending Plaintiff's time to respond to Signature's Motion for Summary Judgment through and including 2/12/2025. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/10/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
37 37 misc Proposed Order Fri 02/07 3:30 PM
Proposed Order by Consent for Extension by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A.. (FIOROVANTI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/27 3:35 PM
ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to31 motion for summary judgment; Motion set for 3/4/2025 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/27/2025. (jal, )
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Proposed Order Mon 01/27 11:06 AM
Proposed Order by Consent for Extension by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A.. (CANNING, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/10 12:46 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/10/2025. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/08 1:17 PM
Set Deadlines as to33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 01/07 12:31 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A.. (CANNING, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/26 10:26 AM
Set Deadlines as to31 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 1/21/2025 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
32 32 respm Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion Mon 12/23 5:09 PM
STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by PARAGON PRIVATE HEALTH, LLC, SIGNATURE MD, INC. re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment (BAKER, TYLER)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Summary Judgment Mon 12/23 5:05 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by PARAGON PRIVATE HEALTH, LLC, SIGNATURE MD, INC..(BAKER, TYLER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment.,
Att: 2 Declaration of Ryan Wilber in support of Motion for Summary Judgment.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1-Part 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1-Part 3,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
30 30 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/03 12:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint status letter dated December 2, 2024. (Doc. No.29 ). For good cause shown, the deadline to complete fact discovery is hereby extended through February 28, 2025. A status conference via telephone is set for 2/13/2025 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Once all of the parties are on the line, counsel for Plaintiff shall conference in Judge Singh's Chambers at (609) 989-0502. No later than three (3) business days prior to the telephone status conference, the parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF not to exceed three (3) pages, setting forth the status of discovery and identifying any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 12/3/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
29 29 misc Letter Mon 12/02 9:59 PM
Letter from Michael J. Canning re 28 Text Order,,, Set Hearings,,. (CANNING, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 12/02 9:32 AM
22 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory ,21 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. (jab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
28 28 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/07 7:48 AM
TEXT ORDER: A status conference via telephone is set for 12/4/2024 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Once all of the parties are on the line, counsel for Plaintiff shall conference in Judge Singh's Chambers at (609) 989-0502. No later than three (3) business days prior to the telephone status conference, the parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF not to exceed three (3) pages, setting forth the status of discovery and identifying any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/7/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
27 27 misc Status Report Tue 11/05 3:38 PM
STATUS REPORT by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A.. (CANNING, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
26 26 order Text Order Tue 08/13 8:49 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF by no later than 11/5/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/13/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
25 25 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 08/12 4:05 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A. re22 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (CANNING, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 08/13 8:46 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 8/12/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
24 24 misc Status Report Wed 08/07 3:35 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A.. (CANNING, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
23 23 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Fri 08/02 6:16 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by PARAGON PRIVATE HEALTH, LLC, SIGNATURE MD, INC. re22 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (BAKER, TYLER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
22 22 motion Letters Rogatory Tue 07/23 11:10 AM
Amended MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A..(CANNING, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letters Rogatory
21 21 motion Letters Rogatory Tue 07/23 8:44 AM
MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A..(CANNING, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letters Rogatory
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Tue 07/23 10:32 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The21 "MOTION" submitted by MICHAEL CANNING on 7/23/2024 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user and local counsel is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. Pro Hac Vice attorneys may hand sign documents. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/23 10:32 AM
Set Deadlines as to21 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory . Motion set for 8/19/2024 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/23 2:41 PM
Set Deadlines as to22 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory . Motion set for 8/19/2024 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 05/15 12:23 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David M. Oppenheim to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FIOROVANTI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 05/15 12:22 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Phillip A. Bock to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FIOROVANTI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Wed 05/15 3:02 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Phillip A. Bock & David M. Oppenheim $ 500, receipt number TRE138584 (jal, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Wed 05/15 4:39 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID M. OPPENHEIM and PHILLIP A. BOCK, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (amv)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/10 11:25 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/12/2024 at 2:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be with leave of Court and filed by no later than 8/30/2024. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 12/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 5/10/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/07 11:11 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to DAVID M. OPPENHEIM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 5/7/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/07 11:10 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Philip Bock. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 5/7/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/07 8:47 AM
Set Deadlines as to15 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Phillip A. Bock . Motion set for 6/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 05/07 4:46 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Initial Pretrial Conference via Microsoft Teams held on 5/7/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/06 3:57 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Phillip A. Bock by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A..(FIOROVANTI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Phillip A. Bock,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed CO for Admission PHV
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/06 3:48 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David M. Oppenheim by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A..(FIOROVANTI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert. of David M. Oppenheim,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed CO for PHV
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
13 13 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 04/23 4:03 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A..(CANNING, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
12 12 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 03/22 1:01 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2024 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/21/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/21 4:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by PARAGON PRIVATE HEALTH, LLC, SIGNATURE MD, INC..(BAKER, TYLER)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 03/21 4:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PARAGON PRIVATE HEALTH, LLC, SIGNATURE MD, INC. identifying Signature MD, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BAKER, TYLER)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
9 9 1 pgs notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 02/23 6:49 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jay Ramsey to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-15115557.) (BAKER, TYLER)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Mon 05/13 3:51 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAY RAMSEY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Stipulation and Order Wed 02/21 8:39 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendants Paragon Private Health, LLC and Signature MD, Inc., to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint herein is extended to and including 3/21/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 2/20/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/20 1:04 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jay Ramsey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 2/20/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/20 10:11 AM
Set Deadlines as to6 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/18/2024 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
6 6 3 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/16 4:17 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PARAGON PRIVATE HEALTH, LLC, SIGNATURE MD, INC..(BAKER, TYLER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certification of Jay Ramsey,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Fri 02/16 8:54 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Stipulation5 filed by TYLER BAKER on 2/15/24 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. The Clerk's Office has terminated the Motion. In the future, please use the *STIPULATION* event when filing a stipulation. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (amv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
5 5 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/15 6:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Move or Otherwise Respond by PARAGON PRIVATE HEALTH, LLC, SIGNATURE MD, INC.. (BAKER, TYLER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Thu 02/01 2:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Paragon Private Health, LLC on 01 30-2024 filed by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A.. (FIOROVANTI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Thu 02/01 2:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Signature MD, Inc. on 01 29-2024 filed by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A.. (FIOROVANTI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 01/25 3:13 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PARAGON PRIVATE HEALTH, LLC and SIGNATURE MD, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
1 1 23 pgs COMPLAINT against PARAGON PRIVATE HEALTH, SIGNATURE MD, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15035976) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ADVANTAGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES.(FIOROVANTI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/25 2:38 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (mlh)
Related: [-]