Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth D Katz
Case #: 4:24-bk-40076
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ASA EWC, LLC, Debtor
96 Park St
Hudson, MA 01749-2436
Represented By
James P. Ehrhard
Ehrhard & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of US. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Monday, April 15, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 04/15 8:58 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (pf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 13, 2024
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Sun 04/14 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Related [+] Notice Date 04/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 43 Notice of Dismissal
Thursday, April 11, 2024
43 43 crt_gen Notice of Dismissal Thu 04/11 8:25 AM
Notice of Dismissal For Other Reasons. (ag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 03/27 5:17 PM
Endorsed Order dated 3/27/2024 Re:36 Expedited Motion filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC to Approve [Re:33 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay and35 Settlement Agreement]. THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AS AMENDED IS APPROVED. SEE ORDER OF EVEN DATE. THE HEARINGS ON THE MOTION FOR DETERMINATION THAT THE AUTOMATIC STAY IS NOT APPLICABLE [DOCKET #20] AND THE MOTION TO APPROVE AMENDED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT [DOCKET #36] SET FOR MARCH 28, 2024 ARE CANCELED. (sas)
Related: [-]
41 41 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Approval Wed 03/27 4:50 PM
Order dated 3/27/2024 Re:36 Expedited Motion filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC to Approve [Re:33 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay,35 Settlement Agreement]. See Order for Full Text. (ag)
Related: [-]
40 40 12 pgs order Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay Wed 03/27 4:44 PM
Order dated 3/27/2024 Re:20 Expedited Motion filed by Creditor Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC for Determination that the Automatic Stay is Not Applicable or, in the Alternative, for Relief from Stay Re: 80 Boston Turnpike, Unit 2A, Shrewsbury, MA. See Order for Full Text. (ag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
39 39 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Wed 03/20 6:05 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-] 36 Motion to Approve,38 Order To Set Hearing
38 38 1 pgs order Order To Set Hearing Wed 03/20 10:15 AM
Endorsed Order dated 3/20/24 Re:36 Expedited Motion filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC to Approve [Re:33 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay,35 Settlement Agreement]. A HEARING ON THIS MOTION IS SET FOR MARCH 28, 2024 AT 10:00 AM IN WORCESTER, COURTROOM 3. THE DEADLINE FOR OBJECTIONS IS MARCH 25, 2024. THE DEBTOR IS ORDERED TO PROVIDE ELECTRONIC AND TELEPHONIC NOTICE OF THE HEARING AND OBJECTION DEADLINE AND FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE REFLECTING THE SAME BY 5:00 PM TODAY, MARCH 20, 2024. (ag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
37 37 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Tue 03/19 11:10 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay,35 Settlement Agreement,36 Motion to Approve
36 36 motion Approve Tue 03/19 11:08 PM
Expedited Motion filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC to Approve [Re:33 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay,35 Settlement Agreement] with certificate of service. (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Amended Settlement Agreement
Att: 3 Amended Settlement Agreement Signature Page
35 35 misc Settlement Agreement Tue 03/19 11:03 PM
Settlement Agreement by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC and Inland Commercial Real Estate Services, LLC Amended Related [+] filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay
Att: 1 Signed Signature Page
Friday, March 15, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 03/15 2:42 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 3/15/24 Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC. STATUS CONFERENCE HELD. (ag)
Related: [-]
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay Fri 03/15 2:38 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 3/15/2024 Re:20 Expedited Motion filed by Creditor Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC for Determination that the Automatic Stay is Not Applicable or, in the Alternative, for Relief from Stay Re: 80 Boston Turnpike, Unit 2A, Shrewsbury, MA. THIS HEARING IS CONTINUED TO MARCH 28, 2024 AT 10:00AM IN WORCESTER, COURTROOM 3. ON OR BEFORE 03/19/24 AT 4:00PM, THE MOVANT AND THE DEBTOR ARE ORDERED TO FILE AN AMENDED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AS WELL AS A MOTION TO APPROVE AMENDED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. (ag)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held and Continued (Chap) Fri 03/15 2:36 PM
Hearing Held and Continued to 03/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Worcester Courtroom 3 Re:20 Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Creditor Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC. (ag)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Fri 03/15 2:40 PM
Hearing Held Related [+]. (ag)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC
Thursday, March 14, 2024
32 32 misc Settlement Agreement Thu 03/14 11:28 PM
Settlement Agreement by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC and Inland Commercial Real Estate Services, LLC with suggested Draft Order Related [+] filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Relief From Stay,27 Opposition,28 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay
Att: 1 Signed signature page
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
31 31 claims Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only) Wed 03/13 11:41 AM
Request for Notice filed by Creditor Simmons Bank, SSB (webclaimusr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
30 30 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Mon 03/04 7:06 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney James P. Ehrhard in the amount of $10,262.00. Plus $1,738.00 paid to debtor`s counsel for court filing fees filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
29 29 misc Schedules (Original) Fri 03/01 12:58 AM
Schedules A-H. along with 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Disclosure of Ownership Statement Rule, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay Thu 02/29 2:33 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 2/29/2024 Re:20 Expedited Motion filed by Creditor Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC for Determination that the Automatic Stay is Not Applicable or, in the Alternative, for Relief from Stay Re: 80 Boston Turnpike, Unit 2A, Shrewsbury, MA. THIS HEARING IS CONTINUED TO MARCH 15, 2024 AT 10:00 AM IN WORCESTER COURTROOM 3. (ag)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held and Continued (Chap) Thu 02/29 2:31 PM
Hearing Held and Continued to 03/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at Worcester Courtroom 3 Re:20 Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Creditor Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC. (ag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
27 27 answer Opposition Wed 02/28 2:54 PM
Opposition with certificate of service filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC Re:20 Motion filed by Creditor Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC for Relief from Stay Re: with certificate of service and proposed order Fee Amount $199, (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Wed 02/28 9:59 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/28/2024 Re:25 Motion filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC to Extend Time to Answer20 Motion for Relief From Stay. GRANTED. INASMUCH AS THE DEADLINE IS EXTENDED TO 3:00 P.M. TODAY, FEBRUARY 28, 2024. (pf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
25 25 motion Extend Time Tue 02/27 11:58 PM
Motion filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC to Extend Time to Answer [Re:20 Motion for Relief From Stay,21 Order To Set Hearing] with certificate of service. (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Tue 02/27 9:08 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/27/2024 Re:23 Motion filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC to Extend Time to File Documents. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR FILING THE MISSING DOCUMENTS IS EXTENDED TO FEBRUARY 29, 2024. (ag)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extend Time Tue 02/27 8:26 AM
Motion filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:14 Order on Motion to Extend] with certificate of service. (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
22 22 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Wed 02/21 2:17 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Creditor Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC (Lavenburg, David)
Related: [-] 21 Order To Set Hearing
21 21 1 pgs order Order To Set Hearing Wed 02/21 9:19 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/21/24 Re:20 Expedited Motion filed by Creditor Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC for Determination that the Automatic Stay is Not Applicable or, in the Alternative, for Relief from Stay Re: 80 Boston Turnpike, Unit 2A, Shrewsbury, MA. A HEARING ON THIS MOTION IS SET FOR FEBRUARY 29, 2024 AT 12:00 P.M. IN WORCESTER, COURTROOM 3. THE DEADLINE FOR OBJECTIONS IS FEBRUARY 27, 2024. THE MOVANT IS ORDERED TO PROVIDE TELEPHONIC AND ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF THE MOTION AND HEARING TO THE DEBTOR AND TO THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE, AND TO FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE REFLECTING SAME, BY 4:00 P.M. TODAY, FEBRUARY 21, 2024. (ag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
20 20 motion Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay Tue 02/20 10:45 AM
Motion filed by Creditor Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC for Relief from Stay Re: with certificate of service and proposed order Fee Amount $199, Objections due by 03/5/2024. (Lavenburg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
crditcrd none Tue 02/20 10:47 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-40076 ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A20362519, amount $ 199.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#20
trustee Statement of Dial-In Information Tue 02/20 1:07 PM
Telephonic Meeting Information for Section 341 Meeting of Creditors: Dial-in Number: 877.716.4195 Participant Code: 3585070. For International Call Information Please Contact the Trustee. (Meunier, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 18, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Tue 02/20 9:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order
Friday, February 16, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 02/16 10:23 AM
Amended Order dated 2/16/24 Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC. IN ACCORDANCE WITH MASSACHUSETTS LOCAL BANKRUPTCY RULE 1002-1(a)(1), A STATUS CONFERENCE IN THIS CASE IS SET FOR MARCH 15, 2024 AT 10:00 A.M. IN THE FEDERAL BUILDING AND COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3, 595 MAIN STREET, WORCESTER, MA. THE COURT WILL SERVE A COPY OF THIS AMENDED ORDER ON ALL CREDITORS AND PARTIES THAT HAVE FILED A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE. (ag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/15 11:49 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-] 12 Order To Set Hearing
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 02/15 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 02/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Court's Notice of 341 sent - 11 Corporation
Monday, February 12, 2024
15 15 crt_gen Court's Notice of 341 Sent 11 Corporation Mon 02/12 1:24 PM
Court's Notice of 341 sent. (pf)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Mon 02/12 11:07 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/12/2024 Re:13 Motion filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC to Extend Time to File Documents. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR FILING THE MISSING DOCUMENTS IS EXTENDED TO FEBRUARY 25, 2024. (ag)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extend Time Mon 02/12 8:00 AM
Motion filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:3 Order to Update] with certificate of service. (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-]
court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Mon 02/12 1:24 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/4/2024 at 02:30 PM as a Telephonic Meeting. (pf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order To Set Hearing Fri 02/09 11:03 AM
Order dated 2/9/24 Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC. IN ACCORDANCE WITH MASSACHUSETTS LOCAL BANKRUPTCY RULE 1002-1(A)(1), A STATUS CONFERENCE IN THIS CASE IS SET FOR MARCH 15, 2024 AT 10:00 A.M. IN THE FEDERAL BUILDING AND COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3, 595 MAIN STREET, SPRINGFIELD, MA. THE DEBTOR IS ORDERED TO PROVIDE NOTICE OF THE STATUS CONFERENCE TO THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE, ALL SECURED CREDITORS, THE 20 LARGEST UNSECURED CREDITORS, TAXING AUTHORITIES, AND ANY PARTY HAVING FILED A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE, AND TO FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE REFLECTING SAME, BY FEBRUARY 15, 2024. (ag)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Fri 02/09 9:16 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/9/2024 Re:8 Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Dismiss Case. WITHDRAWN (ag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
10 10 motion Withdraw Document Thu 02/08 4:37 PM
Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Withdraw [Re:8 Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Dismiss Case with certificate of service.] with certificate of service. (Meunier, Stephen)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Thu 02/08 8:54 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/8/2024 Re:8 Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Dismiss Case. GRANTED, EFFECTIVE 4:00 P.M. ON FEBRUARY 9, 2024 UNLESS THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE, UPON RECEIPT OF PROOF OF SATISFACTORY INSURANCE, FILES A WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRUSTEES MOTION TO DISMISS PRIOR TO THAT TIME. THE DEBTOR MAY FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THIS ORDER, WITHIN 14 DAYS OF ITS ENTRY, IN THE EVENT THAT THE DEBTOR OBTAINS SATISFACTORY INSURANCE WITHIN THAT TIME. (ag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Case Wed 02/07 4:53 PM
Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Dismiss Case with certificate of service. (Meunier, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
7 7 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Mon 02/05 8:11 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Update
6 6 misc Certificate of Vote Mon 02/05 7:58 AM
Certificate of Vote - Corporate Vote filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
5 5 misc Signature Page Thu 02/01 8:35 AM
Signature Page Related [+] filed by Debtor ASA EWC, LLC (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Update
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 01/30 4:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers by David A. Lavenburg Esq. with certificate of service filed by Creditor Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC (Lavenburg, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
crditcrd none Mon 01/29 8:14 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-40076 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt Number A20333531, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, January 26, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order to Update Fri 01/26 11:14 AM
Corrected Order to Update. Upload Creditor Matrix Due 1/29/2024. Attorney/Debtor Signature Page due 1/31/2024. Corporate Vote and Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Due 2/2/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Disclosure of Ownership Statement Rule, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certification of Section 522q due 2/9/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 2/9/2024. (ag)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Order to Update Fri 01/26 11:03 AM
Order to Update. Upload Creditor Matrix Due By 1/29/24. Attorney/Debtor Signature Page due 1/31/2024. Corporate Vote and Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Due 2/2/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders Disclosure of Ownership Statement Rule, Schedules A-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certification of Section 522q due 2/9/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 2/9/2024. (ag)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 01/26 12:52 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. with deficiencies. Filing Fee in the Amount of $1738 Filed by ASA EWC, LLC. (Ehrhard, James)
Related: [-]