Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Jul 18, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, July 26, 2024
35 35 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 07/26 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
34 34 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 07/18 4:27 PM
It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That Plaintiff's Objections Doc. 32 are OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation Doc. 18 is ADOPTED AND CONFIRMED and made a part of this Order in its entirety. The Motion for Protective Order to Quash Arbitration Subpoenas Doc. 1 is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file.. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/17/2024. (EAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
33 33 respoth Response Mon 04/22 1:37 PM
RESPONSE re32 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation filed by American Freight, LLC. (Schindler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
32 32 respoth Objection Mon 04/08 9:46 PM
OBJECTION re18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 MOTION for Protective Order filed by American Freight, LLCW.S. Badcock LLC. .(Shapiro, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Arbitration Clause
Friday, March 22, 2024
31 31 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 03/22 4:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 30 MMS Group LLC's Amended Motion for Extension of Time. See Doc. No. 29. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 3/22/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 03/22 4:08 PM
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Report and Recommendation by MMS Group LLC. (Shapiro, Seth)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 03/22 3:41 PM
ORDER granting 28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for MMS Group LLC to file objections to the Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 18) is extended up to and including April 8, 2024. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 3/22/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 03/22 1:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation [DE 18] by MMS Group LLC. (Shapiro, Seth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
27 27 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 03/21 12:19 PM
ORDER denying 21 MMS Group LLC's Amended Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 3/21/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/19 10:20 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 Amended MOTION to Stay filed by American Freight, LLC, W.S. Badcock LLC. (Schindler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of appearance Thu 03/14 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda Phang on behalf of MMS Group LLC (Phang, Brenda)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of appearance Thu 03/14 5:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Seth M. Shapiro on behalf of MMS Group LLC (Shapiro, Seth)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Supplement Thu 03/14 2:52 PM
SUPPLEMENT re21 Amended MOTION to Stay by MMS Group LLC. (Shapiro, Seth)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/14 2:44 PM
NOTICE by MMS Group LLC re21 Amended MOTION to Stay (Shapiro, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order Granting Claimant's Motion to Stay
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
21 21 motion Stay Wed 03/13 7:08 PM
Amended MOTION to Stay by MMS Group LLC. (Shapiro, Seth)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 03/13 10:48 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) 19 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/13/2024. (Dalton, Jr., Roy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
19 19 motion Stay Mon 03/11 5:31 PM
MOTION to Stay by MMS Group LLC. (Shapiro, Seth)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 03/11 10:26 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Non-Parties W.S. Badcock LLC's and American Freight, LLC's Motion for Protective Order to Quash Arbitration Subpoenas. For the reasons discussed herein, the undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS that the Court GRANT Movants' Motion for Protective Order to Quash Arbitration Subpoenas (Doc. No. 1), and thereafter DIRECT the Clerk of Court to close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 3/11/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/06 3:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re1 MOTION for Protective Order filed by American Freight, LLC, W.S. Badcock LLC.(Schindler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alex Bakes
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
16 16 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Wed 02/21 9:11 AM
ORDER re 1 Non-Parties W.S. Badcock LLC's and American Freight, LLC's Motion for Protective Order to Quash Arbitration Subpoenas, 13 MMS Group LLC's Memorandum of Law in Opposition. It is ORDERED that, within fourteen (14) days of this Order, Movants shall file a supplemental reply brief, not to exceed twenty (20) pages in length, addressing the issues outlined in this Order and those raised by the Response (Doc. No. 13). In light of this Order, Movants' Motion for Leave to File Reply (Doc. No. 15) will be DENIED as moot. See PDF Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/21/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
15 15 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document Tue 02/20 4:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order to Quash Arbitration Subpoenas by American Freight, LLC, W.S. Badcock LLC. (Schindler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 02/20 9:44 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert M. Einhorn of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
13 13 17 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition Fri 02/16 7:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in opposition re1 Motion for Protective Order filed by MMS Group LLC.(Einhorn, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A (Kahn steps down),
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B (Email disclosing subpoenas) -,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C (Badcock Subpoena),
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D (American Freight Subpoena),
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E (email to Leesfield with subpoenas) -,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F (1st Order on Subpoenas),
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. G (2nd Order on Subpoenas),
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. H (American Freight Objections to Subpoena),
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. I (Badcock Objections to Subpoena),
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. J (post-M&C emails)2,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. K(Motion to Enforce)1,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. L (First Motion to Quash)2,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. M (M&C on rejected motion)2,
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex. N (Second Motion to Quash)1,
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex. O (4th Order on Subpoenas)1,
Att: 16 Exhibit Ex. P (Partial Order on Motion for Protective Order)1
Friday, February 09, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Fri 02/09 12:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 MMS Group LLC's Motion for Extension of Time. The Court does not require a response to rule on the motion. The deadline for MMS Group LLC to respond to the Motion for Protective Order to Quash Arbitration Subpoenas 1 is extended up to and including February 16, 2024. However, going forward, future motions that fail to comply with all applicable Local Rules (the instant motion fails to comply with Local Rules 1.08 and 3.01(a)), may be stricken or summarily denied without further notice. The parties are further reminded of their obligations under Local Rule 3.01(g), including subsection (g)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/9/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 02/08 4:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 MOTION for Protective Order by MMS Group LLC. (Einhorn, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of appearance Thu 02/08 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Einhorn on behalf of MMS Group LLC (Einhorn, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
misc Pay Fee Thu 02/01 4:22 PM
FEE PAID. Filing fee for new miscellaneous case, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21725131 for $52 paid. (Schindler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
9 9 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/26 2:21 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-mc-2-RBD-LHP. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED:1 MOTION for Protective Order. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. (RPB)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case to Another Judge w/in Division Fri 01/26 2:17 PM
ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(2)(A). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 1/26/2024. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 01/26 9:05 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Peter G. Siachos, Andrew R. Schindler and James Messenger of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 01/26 9:04 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Peter G. Siachos and James Messenger Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
5 5 misc Declaration Fri 01/26 8:54 AM
DECLARATION of William Trimble in support re1 MOTION for Protective Order by American Freight, LLC, W.S. Badcock LLC. (e-portal) (AJS)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Fri 01/26 8:52 AM
DECLARATION of Kenneth Todd Evans in Support re1 MOTION for Protective Order by American Freight, LLC, W.S. Badcock LLC. (e-portal) (AJS)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 01/26 8:50 AM
DECLARATION of Daniel Meyer in Support re1 MOTION for Protective Order by American Freight, LLC, W.S. Badcock LLC. (e-portal) (AJS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Fri 01/26 8:48 AM
DECLARATION of Joanna Doherty in Support re1 MOTION for Protective Order by American Freight, LLC, W.S. Badcock LLC. (e-portal)(AJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
1 1 motion Protective Order Fri 01/26 8:43 AM
MOTION for Protective Order to Quash Arbitration Subpoenas by American Freight, LLC, W.S. Badcock LLC. No Filing fee paid/No IFP motion filed. (e-portal) (AJS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. Modified text on 1/26/2024 (AJS). Chambers notified and Counsel advised via email to pay filing fee- Modified on 1/26/2024 (AJS)
Related: [-]