Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:24-cv-80097
Nature of Suit450 Other Statutes - Commerce
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Terminated:Apr 11, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 6:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Resurgent Capital Services, LP
a Delaware limited partnership 55 Beattie Place suite 110
greenville, SC 29601
Represented By
John Michael Marees, II
Messer Strickler, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Moise Medina
an individual 328 NW 12th Ave.
Delray Beach, FL 33444
Represented By
Robert William Murphy
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 06, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 05/07 11:54 AM
ORDER CLOSING CASE. (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/6/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Mon 04/29 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Moise Medina (Murphy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Thu 04/11 8:41 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Wed 04/10 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Moise Medina (Murphy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 03/11 11:45 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 8/2/2024., Expert Discovery due by 8/16/2024., Dispositive Motions due by 9/3/2024., Jury Trial set for 12/2/2024 at 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 11/27/2024 at 10:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 10/16/2024 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 10/2/2024. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee) [LINK:Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 1:34 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resurgent Capital Services, LP identifying Corporate Parent Alegis Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Resurgent Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate LVNV Funding, LLC for Resurgent Capital Services, LP (Marees, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/20 1:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Resurgent Capital Services, LP. Attorney John Michael Marees, II added to party Resurgent Capital Services, LP(pty:dft). (Marees, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Thu 02/01 10:13 AM
Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Moise Medina (Murphy, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/01 10:12 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Moise Medina (Murphy, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/01 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Filing Status Report on Service by Moise Medina re5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Murphy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Service Spreadsheet
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 01/31 2:33 PM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/31/2024. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 01/30 1:54 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 01/30 11:50 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Moise Medina. Resurgent Capital Services, LP served on 1/29/2024, response/answer due 2/20/2024. (Murphy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/26 3:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Resurgent Capital Services, LP. (nan)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 01/26 3:49 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/26 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT for Damages and Incidental Relief against Resurgent Capital Services, LP. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17243905, filed by Moise Medina.(Murphy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)