New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lashann Dearcy Hall
Referred: Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:24-cv-00566
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Case in other court:Supreme Court State of New York, Suffolk County, 631593/2023
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Mary Ann Ambrosini
Represented By
Joshua S Shteierman
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
David H. Arntsen
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Robert Finn
Represented By
Joshua S Shteierman
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
David H. Arntsen
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Herr
Represented By
Joshua S Shteierman
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
David H. Arntsen
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Suzanne Mensch
Represented By
Joshua S Shteierman
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
David H. Arntsen
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Charise Miller
Represented By
Joshua S Shteierman
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
David H. Arntsen
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Carolyn Probst
Represented By
Joshua S Shteierman
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
David H. Arntsen
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Westhampton Beach School District
Represented By
Joshua S Shteierman
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
David H. Arntsen
Volz & Vigliotta, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Mattera
Represented By
Christian Killoran
Killoran Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
20 20 misc Letter Tue 04/29 8:14 AM
Letter requesting adjournment of conference by Justin Mattera (Killoran, Christian)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Tue 04/29 10:52 AM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: re20 Letter filed by Justin Mattera. On consent of the parties, the deadline to complete all discovery, both fact and expert, is extended to 7/30/25. The deadline to commence summary judgment motion practice is extended to 8/15/25. The 4/30/25 pretrial conference is adjourned to 8/20/25 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/29/2025. (KDW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 10/15 12:44 PM
Electronic ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. On consent of the parties, the deadline to complete discovery is extended as follows: the deadline to complete depositions is extended to 2/3/25; the deadline to identify case-in-chief experts and exchange Rule 26 disclosures is extended to 2/17/25; the deadline to identify rebuttal experts and serve Rule 26 disclosures is extended to 3/17/25; the deadline to commence summary judgment motion practice is extended to 4/17/25. The pretrial conference scheduled for 1/13/25 is adjourned to 4/30/25 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 10/15/2024. (KDW)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
19 19 motion Dismiss Mon 10/14 2:39 PM
Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Westhampton Beach School District, Suzanne Mensch, Carolyn Probst, Christopher Herr, Charise Miller, Mary Ann Ambrosini, Robert Finn. (Shteierman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint dated May 2, 2024,
Att: 3 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 5 Memorandum in Opposition,
Att: 6 Declaration Reply Declaration,
Att: 7 Memorandum in Support Reply Memorandum in Support,
Att: 8 Affidavit of Service
Saturday, October 12, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Sat 10/12 9:53 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Westhampton Beach School District, Suzanne Mensch, Carolyn Probst, Christopher Herr, Charise Miller, Mary Ann Ambrosini, Robert Finn. (Shteierman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Fri 09/27 9:38 AM
Letter by Justin Mattera (Killoran, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Opposition
Friday, August 30, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Fri 08/30 1:03 PM
Letter regarding filing of Motion by Mary Ann Ambrosini, Robert Finn, Christopher Herr, Suzanne Mensch, Charise Miller, Carolyn Probst, Westhampton Beach School District (Shteierman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
order Order(Other) Mon 07/22 12:31 PM
ORDER: The pre-motion conference scheduled for July 23, 2024, at 2:00 pm. is ADJOURNED until July 23, 2024, at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4H North. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 7/22/2024. (MLR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Fri 05/24 3:06 PM
ORDER: Defendants' motion11 for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of their motion to dismiss is GRANTED. A pre-motion conference shall be held before Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on July 23, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4H North. At the pre-motion conference, the Court will order a briefing schedule. The parties should anticipate a schedule that will require service of their motion within a short time after the pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 5/24/2024. (CG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/22 11:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadlines set; see attached order. Next Status Conference set for 7/9/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/22/2024. (KG)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Wed 05/22 11:55 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke: Initial Conference Hearing held on 5/22/2024. A scheduling order has been entered. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/22/2024. (KG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/21 1:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Justin Mattera. (Killoran, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
order Status Report Order Fri 05/17 4:01 PM
ORDER: On May 6, 2024, Defendants filed a renewed motion for a pre-motion conference11 in anticipation of a motion to dismiss. In direct contravention of the Court's Individual Practices, Plaintiff failed to respond by May 13, 2024. See J. DeArcy Hall Individual Practices, Section III. A.5. Plaintiff is directed to respond to Defendants' motion11 for a pre-motion conference on or before May 20, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. Failure to respond may result in the issuance of sanctions, including dismissal for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 5/17/2024. (CG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 05/15 11:55 AM
Electronic ORDER denying DE12 Motion to Stay. Given that under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) the decision to stay discovery is within the discretion of the district court, Defendants' motion to stay discovery pending the resolution of Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss is denied. See Palladino v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. , 345 F.R.D. 270, 273 (E.D.N.Y. 2024) ("The filing of a dispositive motion in and of itself does not halt discovery obligations.") (internal citations and quotation marked omitted); Republic of Turkey v. Christie's Inc. , 316 F. Supp. 3d 675, 677 (S.D.N.Y. 2018) ("[A] district court has considerable discretion to stay discovery pursuant to Rule 26(c).") (internal citations and quotation marks omitted). The parties shall appear for the initial conference scheduled for 5/22/2024 at 11:30 a.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/15/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
12 12 motion Stay Tue 05/07 11:37 AM
Letter MOTION to Stay of Discovery by Mary Ann Ambrosini, Robert Finn, Christopher Herr, Suzanne Mensch, Charise Miller, Carolyn Probst, Westhampton Beach School District. (Shteierman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
11 11 motion Pre Motion Conference Mon 05/06 11:30 AM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Mary Ann Ambrosini, Robert Finn, Christopher Herr, Suzanne Mensch, Charise Miller, Carolyn Probst, Westhampton Beach School District. (Shteierman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit February 21, 2024 PreMotion Conference Request
Thursday, May 02, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/02 12:26 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Justin Mattera. (Killoran, Christian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Tue 04/16 1:51 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's request8 for leave to amend his complaint is GRANTED. Defendants' motion for a pre-motion conference6 in anticipation of their motion to dismiss, is DENIED with leave with renew. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/16/2024. (CG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/18 11:33 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/22/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/18/2024. (KG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SIL Individual Rules,
Att: 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 motion Pre Motion Conference Mon 02/26 11:46 AM
MOTION for pre motion conference by Justin Mattera. (Killoran, Christian)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/26 10:24 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference requesting permission to file Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Killoran, Christian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
6 6 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 02/21 3:48 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference requesting permission to file Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss by Mary Ann Ambrosini, Robert Finn, Christopher Herr, Suzanne Mensch, Charise Miller, Carolyn Probst, Westhampton Beach School District. (Shteierman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
5 5 misc State Court Record Tue 02/06 12:27 PM
STATE COURT RECORD Received from Suffolk County District Court by T. Lorenz, Admin. Asst., enclosing a Certified Copy of Clerk's Minutes for the E-filed Supreme Court case, Index # 631593/2023. (MLR)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/02 9:36 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 2/22/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/2/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/01 10:18 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mary Ann Ambrosini, Robert Finn, Christopher Herr, Suzanne Mensch, Charise Miller, Carolyn Probst, Westhampton Beach School District. (Arntsen, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 01/26 2:57 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 01/26 12:37 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDR) (LJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/26/2024) Additional Corrections
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 01/26 11:12 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Suffolk County Supreme Court, case number 631593/2023. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-17503541) (Shteierman, Joshua) Modified on 1/26/2024 (LJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavits of Service,
Att: 2 29 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons & Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/26 2:55 PM
Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]