New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 7:24-bk-22066
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
SAS Group Inc
220 White Plains Rd
Tarrytown, NY 10591-5837
Represented By
Dawn Kirby
Kirby Aisner & Curley, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
39 39 26 pgs plan Disclosure Statement for Small Business Wed 03/12 9:39 AM
Chapter 11 Small Business Disclosure Statement filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
38 38 11 pgs misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 01/27 10:00 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 12/31/2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 01/27 9:47 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 11/30/2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 01/27 9:35 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 10/31/2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
35 35 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Thu 01/23 4:09 PM
Amended Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 3/31/2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
34 34 13 pgs plan Amended/Modified Plan Thu 01/23 10:43 AM
First Amended Plan filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
33 33 order Motion, Approve Wed 12/11 8:10 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
32 32 13 pgs plan Chapter 11 Small Business Plan Thu 11/21 8:01 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business Plan filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
31 31 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Thu 10/24 1:47 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 9/30/2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Thu 10/24 1:45 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 8/31/2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
29 29 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Tue 10/22 2:47 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 7/31/2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Tue 10/22 2:46 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 6/30/2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
27 27 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 10/16 4:43 PM
Motion to Extend Time for Discovery Schedule filed by Jeremy Liss on behalf of United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Liss, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
26 26 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Thu 08/15 9:30 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending May 31, 2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Thu 08/15 9:26 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 1 - 30, 2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/21 1:46 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, Notice of Deadline Requiring Filing Proofs of Claim on or Before April 18, 2024 together with Case Specific Proof of Claim thereto, Related [+] Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, May 20, 2024
23 23 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 05/20 4:04 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing re: Status Conference currently Scheduled for May 21, 2024 filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. with hearing to be held on 6/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 05/20 9:29 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 05/20 9:28 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 05/20 9:25 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2024 Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order RE: Application, Employ Wed 04/24 12:25 PM
Order Signed On 4/24/2024, Authorizing And Approving Retention Of Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP As Attorneys For Debtor As Of January 26, 2024 Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, April 08, 2024
18 18 misc Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Mon 04/08 4:22 PM
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Declaration of Scott Sobo Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
17 17 motion Motion, Approve Tue 04/02 11:55 AM
Motion to Approve Stipulation of Settlement by and between the Debtor and Merchant Factors Corp. pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc with hearing to be held on 4/30/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL). (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Factoring Agreement with Merchant Factors Corp.
Att: 2 Exhibit B- UCC Financing Statement
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Stipulation with Merchant Factors Corp.
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Proposed Order
Att: 5 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, March 07, 2024
16 16 11 pgs order Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Thu 03/07 4:33 PM
Order Signed On 3/7/2024, Establishing Deadline For Filing Proofs Of Claim And Approving The Form And Manner Of Notice Thereof. Proofs of Claim due by 4/18/2024. Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, March 04, 2024
15 15 4 pgs motion Application, Employ Mon 03/04 2:58 PM
Application to Employ Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP as Attorney's for the Debtor filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc with presentment to be held on 3/29/2024 (check with court for location). (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit A- Declaration
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Proposed Order
Friday, February 16, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Motion, Sell Property Free And Clear Of Liens Under Section 363(f) Fri 02/16 4:45 PM
Order Signed On 2/16/2024, Authorizing The Private Sale Of Certain Of The Debtor's Inventory Pursuant To A Purchase Order Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 11
13 13 order So Ordered Stipulation Fri 02/16 4:40 PM
So Ordered Stipulation And Order Signed On 2/16/2024, Providing Adequate Protection And Related Relief With Respect To Secured Claim Of The U.S. Small Business Administration (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/08 8:59 PM
Order Signed On 2/8/2024, Scheduling Hearing On Shortened Notice To Consider Debtor's Motion For Order: (I) Authorizing The Private Sale Of Certain Of The Debtor's Inventory Pursuant To A Purchase Order And (II) Granting A Hearing On Shortened Notice; With hearing to be held on 2/16/2024 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 7 pgs motion Motion, Sell Property Free And Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) (Fee) Thu 02/08 8:15 AM
Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) Debtor's Motion for an order (I) authorizing the sale of "Full Crystal" bottle inventory to RDL Crystal Investors LLC free and clear of any and all claims, liens, encumbrances and other interests pursuant to a purchase order, and (II) granting a hearing on shortened notice; filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Purchase Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - SBA Loan Documents
Att: 3 Exhibit C - SBA UCC-1
Att: 4 Proposed Sale Order
Att: 5 Declaration of Dawn Kirby Pursuant to LBR 9077-1
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 02/08 8:15 AM
Receipt of Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)([LINK 24-22066 shl] ) [motion,msell] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16509551. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #11
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
10 10 2 pgs notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Tue 02/06 1:46 PM
Notice of Presentment of Motion for Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof Related [+] filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. with presentment to be held on 3/5/2024 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom (SHL)(Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-] 9
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
9 9 4 pgs motion Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Tue 02/06 1:39 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim of Motion for Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the form and Manner of Notice Thereof filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc with hearing to be held on 3/5/2024 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom (SHL). (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" Bar Date Order
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" Proposed Bar Date Notice
8 8 ans Statement Tue 02/06 1:38 PM
Statement - INSTRUCTIONS FOR TELEPHONIC SECTION 341 MEETING OF CREDITORS, filed by Andrew D. Velez-Rivera on behalf of United States Trustee. (Velez-Rivera, Andrew)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Tue 02/06 1:28 PM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Andrew D. Velez-Rivera on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/14/2024 at 01:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Velez-Rivera, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
7 7 notice Notice, Appearance Fri 02/02 8:50 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Matthew G Bouslog on behalf of Solo Brands, LLC. (Bouslog, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Fri 02/02 1:41 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Matthew G Bouslog on behalf of Solo Brands, LLC. (Bouslog, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 02/02 1:43 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 24-22066 shl] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B16503949. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #6
Thursday, February 01, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/01 3:38 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Conference Signed On 2/1/2024, With hearing to be held on 2/20/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Thu 02/01 11:31 AM
Pending Deadlines for Schedules & Statement of Financial Affairs Terminated. New creditors added to Schedule E/F: Joseph Bonafe & Solo Brands LLC; a $34.00 fee is due to the court . (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
4 4 29 pgs misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury For Non-Individual Debtors - Official Form 202 Wed 01/31 9:09 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules - Non-Individual , Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 28, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Mon 01/29 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 01/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
Friday, January 26, 2024
2 2 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Fri 01/26 3:22 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/29/2024 at 01:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 01/26 1:45 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 02/9/2024. Schedule A/B due 02/9/2024. Schedule D due 02/9/2024. Schedule E/F due 02/9/2024. Schedule G due 02/9/2024. Schedule H due 02/9/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 02/9/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 02/9/2024. Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration and Signature Form 119 due 02/9/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 02/9/2024, Small Business Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/24/2024, Disclosure Statement due by 7/24/2024, Filed by Dawn Kirby of Kirby Aisner & Curley, LLP on behalf of SAS Group Inc. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Fri 01/26 2:03 PM
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Fri 01/26 2:10 PM
Deficiencies Set: Statement of Operations DUE at Time of Filing. Balance Sheet DUE at Time of Filing. Cash Flow Statement DUE at Time of Filing.. List of Equity Security Holders due 2/9/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 2/9/2024, (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 01/26 2:23 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-22066 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16494606. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Fri 01/26 3:21 PM
Deficiencies Set: Employee Income Record Due: 1/26/2024. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 1/26/2024. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]