Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter D Russin
Case #: 0:24-bk-10741
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jul 25, 2024
Claims Deadline:Aug 29, 2024
Converted:Jun 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
RV Sales of Broward, Inc., Debtor
2051 Griffin Rd
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33312-5912
Represented By
Brian S Behar, Esq
contact info
Debtor
RV Sales of Broward, Inc.
2051 Griffin Rd
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33312-5912
Represented By
Brian S Behar, Esq
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Carol Lynn Fox
5000 T-Rex Ave., Ste. 300
Boca Raton, FL 33431
Represented By
Carol Lynn Fox
contact info
Trustee
Kenneth A Welt
4581 Weston Road Suite 355
Weston, FL 33331
Represented By
Eric J Silver
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
J. Steven Wilkes
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Friday, January 26, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 01/26 1:38 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10741 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A43683193. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Fri 01/26 1:36 PM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 04/5/2024. (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 01/26 1:45 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor RV Sales of Broward, Inc.. (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Equity Security Holders Fri 01/26 1:47 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor RV Sales of Broward, Inc.. (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]