Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Referred: Natalie Hirt Adams
Case #: 8:24-cv-00250
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024
Case in other court:Hillsborough County Circuit Court, 2023-CA-004149
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
James P. Prendergast
Represented By
Adam C. Shelton
Shelton Mckean
contact info
Sean Michael Conahan
Shelton Mckean
contact info
Melissa Marie Deegan
Shelton Mckean
contact info
Plaintiff
Lloyd Pompey
3648 Sugarcreek Drive
Tampa, FL 33619
Represented By
Richard A. Bokor
Richard A. Bokor, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
19 19 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 08/28 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGR)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order Wed 08/28 11:36 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: An earlier order (Doc. 16) directs the parties to confer and to file a case management report no later than August 23, 2024. No report appears on the docket, and Prendergast files a notice (Doc. 17) discussing Pompey's repeated failure to respond to Prendergast. Because Pompey shows no intention of complying with the earlier order, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. The clerk must close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/28/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
17 17 notice Compliance notice Fri 08/23 11:19 AM
NOTICE of compliance re16 Order by James P. Prendergast (Conahan, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/06 9:05 AM
ORDER directing the parties to file a case management report no later than AUGUST 23, 2024; warning Pompey that failure to comply with this order will likely result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/6/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
15 15 order Order Thu 06/20 2:17 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: In accord with the earlier order (Doc. 12), the stay is VACATED. The clerk must re-open the case. Unless counsel appears for Pompey, Pompey proceeds pro se in this action. In accord with Local Rule 3.02, the parties must conduct a planning conference and file a case management scheduling report no later than JULY 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/20/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stay Lifted Fri 06/21 10:19 AM
Case Stay Lifted. (ELM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 03/06 2:24 PM
ORDER granting Richard Bokor's amended motion (Doc. 13 ) to withdraw as counsel for Lloyd Pompey; withdrawing Richard Bokor as counsel; directing the clerk to terminate Richard Bokor from the service list and to add Pompey's contact information. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/6/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
13 13 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Tue 03/05 2:59 PM
First MOTION to Amend 12 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Bokor, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 03/01 4:13 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Richard Bokor's unopposed motion (Doc. 11 ) to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff is GRANTED-IN-PART. This action is STAYED until JUNE 1, 2024, or until the plaintiff might find new counsel, whenever is earlier. Richard Bokor's motion to withdraw is DENIED. Under Local Rule 2.02, if withdrawal results in a person proceeding pro se, the motion to withdraw must include the person's mailing address, e-mail address, and telephone number. Because Bokor's motion fails to include the plaintiff's mailing address, e-mail address, and telephone number, Richard Bokor will REMAIN as plaintiff's counsel on the docket until the plaintiff substitutes counsel or unless Bokor provides the plaintiff's contact information in an amended motion to withdraw. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/1/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Mon 03/04 10:53 AM
Case Stayed. (BD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
11 11 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 02/27 10:36 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Richard A. Bokor to Withdraw as Attorney by Lloyd Pompey. (Bokor, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/09 10:49 AM
NOTICE by Lloyd Pompey Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Bokor, Richard)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/09 10:45 AM
NOTICE by Lloyd Pompey of Pendency of Other Actions (Bokor, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 02/09 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Richard A. Bokor on behalf of Lloyd Pompey. Lead Counsel: Richard A. Bokor. (Bokor, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 01/26 3:36 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL All Counsel of Record of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JOS)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 01/26 2:52 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by James P. Prendergast. Related case(s): Yes (Conahan, Sean)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 01/26 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Sean Michael Conahan on behalf of James P. Prendergast. Lead Counsel: Sean M. Conahan. (Conahan, Sean)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/26 2:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by James P. Prendergast. (Conahan, Sean)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of appearance Fri 01/26 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Melissa Deegan's Appearance by Sean Michael Conahan on behalf of James P. Prendergast (Conahan, Sean)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/26 12:41 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-250-SDM-NHA. (JCG)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 01/26 11:36 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County Circuit Court, case number 2023-CA-004149 filed in State Court on 3/20/2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21701280 filed by James P. Prendergast.(Conahan, Sean) Modified on 1/26/2024 to edit docket text (JOS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Answer,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 7 Exhibit Dec Sheet,
Att: 8 Exhibit Dec Sheet,
Att: 9 Exhibit Demand