Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:F Kay Behm
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 4:24-cv-10212
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 6:26 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Agridient, Inc.
Represented By
Brian J. Masternak
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
Ashley E. Racette
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Sunrise Foods International Inc.
Represented By
Fred K. Herrmann
Kerr, Russell,
contact info
Defendant
Agridient, Inc.
Represented By
Brian J. Masternak
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
Ashley E. Racette
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sunrise Foods International Inc.
Represented By
Fred K. Herrmann
Kerr, Russell,
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, March 27, 2025
25 25 order Stipulation and Order Thu 03/27 12:17 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Service via Email of Non-ECF Papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (SHic)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
24 24 order Stipulation and Order Wed 03/26 4:54 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (SHic)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Wed 03/26 8:38 AM
ORDER Referring Matters for Discovery to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (KCol)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/26 8:37 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (PHASE I): Status Conference set for 7/24/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge F. Kay Behm, Fact Discovery due by 9/26/2025, Expert Discovery due by 11/21/2025, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/6/2026 . Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. Related [+] (KCol)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Wed 03/26 8:39 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 3/27/2025 is Cancelled. (KCol)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
21 21 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Thu 03/20 2:37 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Herrmann, Fred)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
20 20 notice Appear* Fri 02/21 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF Video Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Rule 26 Joint Discovery Plan Deadline: Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2025 at 1:30 PM before District Judge F. Kay Behm . Teams link will be emailed to counsel. (KCol)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
19 19 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 02/12 6:31 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Sunrise Foods International Inc.. (Herrmann, Fred)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 cmp Civil Case - Counterclaim Wed 01/29 8:29 AM
Amended COUNTERCLAIM filed by Agridient, Inc. against Sunrise Foods International Inc. (Racette, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
17 17 30+ pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 01/24 1:56 PM
ORDER Denying10 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Granting14 Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (KCol)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
16 16 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 08/22 2:25 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Abram Miller appearing on behalf of Sunrise Foods International Inc. (Miller, Abram)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
15 15 32 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 08/12 7:32 PM
RESPONSE to14 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Counterclaim filed by Sunrise Foods International Inc.. (Herrmann, Fred)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
14 14 motion Leave to File Fri 08/02 2:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Counterclaim by Agridient, Inc.. (Masternak, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Counterclaim
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 07/24 3:15 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge F. Kay Behm: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 7/24/2024 re10 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim . Arguments of counsel heard and motion taken under advisement. Defendants to submit motion to amend complaint with proposed first amended complaint by 8/2/24. Plaintiff to file response to motion to amend by 8/12/24. Court will then decide the motion to dismiss and the motion to amend and issue a written opinion. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Christin Douglas) (KBro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
13 13 notice Hearing on Motion* Thu 05/09 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING on10 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2024 at 2:00 PM before District Judge F. Kay Behm. Zoom link will be emailed to counsel. |Remote Access Phone Number: +1 669 254 5252 US and Meeting ID: 161 859 8479| (KMac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/01 7:41 PM
REPLY to Response re10 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Sunrise Foods International Inc.. (Herrmann, Fred)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
11 11 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/17 3:19 PM
RESPONSE to10 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Agridient, Inc.. (Racette, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 04/02 10:33 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Video Scheduling Conference on April 11, 2024 is Cancelled re9 Notice to Appear. The Court will reset to a later date. (KMac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss Wed 03/27 6:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Sunrise Foods International Inc.. (Herrmann, Fred)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
9 9 notice Appear* Mon 03/11 10:03 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Video Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2024 at 1:30 PM before District Judge F. Kay Behm. *Microsoft Teams link will be emailed to the parties (KMac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
8 8 15 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Civil Case - Counterclaim Wed 03/06 9:48 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Agridient, Inc. against Sunrise Foods International Inc. by Agridient, Inc.. (Masternak, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
7 7 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/20 11:47 AM
STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to1 Complaint. Response due by 3/5/2024. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (KMac)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
6 6 notice Appearance Mon 02/19 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Masternak on behalf of Agridient, Inc.. (Masternak, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Mon 02/19 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley E. Racette on behalf of Agridient, Inc.. (Racette, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
4 4 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/30 12:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Agridient, Inc. served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Herrmann, Fred)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
3 3 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 01/26 4:20 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sunrise Foods International Inc. (Herrmann, Fred)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Fri 01/26 2:23 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Agridient, Inc.* (DJen)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 01/26 1:13 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Sunrise Foods International Inc. against Agridient, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9638382 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of country - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Herrmann, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Contract No. SC0002601 / PO 4309,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Contract No. SC0002610 / PO 4314,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Contract No. SC0002611 / PO 4315
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 01/26 2:25 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DJen)
Related: [-]