California Southern District Court
Judge:Lupe Rodriguez, Jr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00180
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:0405id Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Defendant
Leland Dudek
Defendant
Martin O'Malley
Plaintiff
Ruby Janet Alvarado

GPO Mar 12 2025
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Merit Brief (Re ECF No. 11). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 3/12/2025.(rxc)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
17 17 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 03/12 10:54 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. The litigation in this matter has concluded.Judgment is entered affirming the decision of the Commissioner and the case is hereby closed.(rxc)
Related: [-]
16 16 23 pgs order Order Wed 03/12 10:48 AM
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Merit Brief Related [+]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 3/12/2025.(rxc)
Related: [-] ECF No.11
Thursday, June 27, 2024
15 15 respm Reply - Other Thu 06/27 2:54 PM
Plaintiff's Reply (Shapiro, Brian) (rxc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
14 14 misc Social Security Commissioner's Brief Mon 06/17 5:12 PM
Social Security Commissioner's Brief by Martin O'Malley. (Bowles, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
13 13 misc Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (GO 707) Tue 06/04 11:42 AM
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Ruby Janet Alvarado.(rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Friday, May 24, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/24 8:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance and Termination of Attorney Justin Martin by Katherine Sarah Bowles on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Bowles, Katherine)Attorney Katherine Sarah Bowles added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft) (rxc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
11 11 misc Social Security Plaintiff's Brief Mon 05/20 2:49 PM
Plaintiff's Opening Brief (Shapiro, Brian) (rxc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
10 10 order Order of Judge Transfer Thu 05/16 10:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr. for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24cv180 LR.(no document attached) (rmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
9 9 misc Status Report Wed 04/24 2:17 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Martin O'Malley. (Martin, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order Setting Briefing Schedule Tue 03/26 11:39 AM
ORDER Setting Mandatory Settlement Procedures and Schedule for Merits Briefing: Responses due by 6/18/2024; Replies due by 7/2/2024. Plaintiff shall file and serve a merits brief no later than May 21, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 3/26/2024.(exs)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Administrative Record Tue 03/26 8:02 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD .(Parker, Katherine) (rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Pages 1-55,
Att: 3 Pages 56-96,
Att: 4 Pages 97-166,
Att: 5 Pages 167-200,
Att: 6 Pages 201-287,
Att: 7 Pages 288-605,
Att: 8 Pages 606-695,
Att: 9 Pages 696-802,
Att: 10 Pages 803-948,
Att: 11 Pages 949-1062
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/27 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Parker on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
5 5 misc Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (GO 707) Tue 02/13 3:36 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Ruby Janet Alvarado. (aas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/06 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Martin, Justin)Attorney Justin Lane Martin added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Social Security Case Assignment Fri 01/26 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Michael S. Berg has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel are hereby notified of plaintiff's right to consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Provided, as an attachment to this notice, is a consent/declination form for plaintiff to complete. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. The Notice of Electronic Filing of the complaint sent by the court to the Commissioner suffices for service of the complaint. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (rxc) (anh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 01/26 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ruby Janet Alvarado. No Parties With Financial Interest. (rxc) (anh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/26 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18534794.), filed by Ruby Janet Alvarado. The new case number is 3:24-cv-180-MSB. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is assigned to the case. (Brian C Shapiro)(rxc) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet