California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:24-cv-00190
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Terminated:Feb 02, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 2:07 AM PDT
Defendant
LoanDepot, Inc.
Plaintiff
Brian Webbe
Represented By
Samuel M Ward
Barrack Rodos And Bacine
contact info
Stephen R Basser
Barrack Rodos And Bacine
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 15, 2024
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 02/15 9:25 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Webbe, upon Defendant LoanDepot, Inc. served on 2/8/2024, answer due 2/29/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jackson Yang, Service of Process Intake Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Ward, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 02/06 11:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER CONSOLIDATING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING THIS CASE by Judge David O. Carter: This case is ORDERED to be consolidated with Daroya Isaiah v. loanDepot, Inc. (8:24-cv-00136-DOC-JDE) (the "Isaiah Matter"). This case shall be administratively closed, and all future filings shall be made under 8:24-cv-00136-DOC-JDE. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
10 10 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Wed 01/31 3:43 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:24-cv-00136 DOC(JDEx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott and Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:24-cv-00190 DOC(JDEx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 01/30 1:44 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/30 1:39 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant LoanDepot, Inc. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 01/29 4:12 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 01/29 4:11 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 01/29 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 01/26 3:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Webbe, identifying Brian Webbe, LoanDepot, Inc.. (Attorney Samuel M Ward added to party Brian Webbe(pty:pla))(Ward, Samuel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 01/26 3:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Brian Webbe. (Ward, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 01/26 3:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Webbe. (Ward, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 01/26 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36804600 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Brian Webbe. (Attorney Stephen R Basser added to party Brian Webbe(pty:pla))(Basser, Stephen)
Related: [-]