Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen J Murphy, III
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:24-cv-10203
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Alisha Bell
Represented By
Christopher M. Trebilcock
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Vincent C. Sallan
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Defendant
Clark Hill, PLC
Represented By
Brian Shekell
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Kathleen H. Klaus
Maddin, Hauser,
contact info
Defendant
Donn Fresard
Represented By
Mark T. Rajt
The Law Offices Of Mark T. Rajt, P.C.
contact info
Mark T. Rajt, Jr.
Law Offices Of Mark T. Rajt, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Gaulker Pointe Communications, LLC
Represented By
Jeanne V. Barron
Johnston, Sztykiel, Hunt, Fraser, Gold & Barron
contact info
Defendant
Timothy Johnson
Represented By
Jeanne V. Barron
Johnston, Sztykiel, Hunt, Fraser, Gold & Barron
contact info
Defendant
Martha G. Scott
Represented By
Christopher M. Trebilcock
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Vincent C. Sallan
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Defendant
Wayne, County of
Represented By
Christopher M. Trebilcock
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Vincent C. Sallan
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Davis [E-filer]
EMAIL: Davisrobert854@gmail.com 180 Eason
Highland Park, MI 48203


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
39 39 appeal Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit* Tue 04/16 3:39 PM
Certificate of Service re38 Notice of Appeal,. (SSch)
Related: [-]
38 38 appeal Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit Tue 04/16 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Robert Davis [E-filer] re36 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Bond,37 Judgment. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9753558 - Fee: $ 605 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Davis [E-filer], Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Judge Murphy's April 15, 2024 Judgment Dismissing With Predjudice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Judge Murphy April 15, 2024 Orderr Granting Motions to Dismiss
Monday, April 15, 2024
37 37 order Judgment* Mon 04/15 6:13 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
36 36 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Bond Mon 04/15 6:07 PM
ORDER Denying22 Motion for Bond, and Granting16 18 19 21 25 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/25 11:02 AM
REPLY to Response re18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alisha Bell, Martha G. Scott. (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/22 11:24 AM
REPLY to Response re19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Wayne, County of. (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/19 2:42 PM
REPLY to Response re21 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Clark Hill, PLC. (Shekell, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/15 10:18 AM
REPLY to Response re22 Joint MOTION for Bond and for Injunction Against Further Litigation filed by Alisha Bell, Clark Hill, PLC, Martha G. Scott, Wayne, County of. (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs
Thursday, March 14, 2024
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/14 2:44 PM
REPLY to Response re25 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12 (b)(6) filed by Donn Fresard. (Rajt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Thomas v. Burt,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-El-Khalil v. Usen
Monday, March 11, 2024
30 30 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/11 11:05 PM
RESPONSE to18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Davis [E-filer]. (Davis [E-filer], Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
29 29 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/08 10:17 PM
RESPONSE to22 Joint MOTION for Bond and for Injunction Against Further Litigation filed by Robert Davis [E-filer]. (Davis [E-filer], Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration filed in State-Court Action.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Plaintiffs Motion for Relief From Judgment/Order Filed in State-Court Action.,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C- Transcript from October 24, 2022 Hearing held in the matter of Davis v Wayne County Election Commission, Patricia Fresard, Kelly Ann Ramsey, et.al., Wayne County Case No. 22-008866-AW.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D-Davis v Wayne County Election Commission, unpublished per curiam opinion of Michigan Court of Appeals, issued May 11, 2023 (Docket No. 362547).,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E-Michigan Court of Appeals June 21, 2023 Letter Awarding Plaintiff Davis Costs against Kiefer Cox and Nicholas John Bobak Hathaway in the matter of Davis v Wayne County Election Commission, Michigan Court of Appeals Docket No. 362547
28 28 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/08 4:09 PM
RESPONSE to19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Robert Davis [E-filer]. (Davis [E-filer], Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Amended Complaint State-Court Action Davis v Wayne County Board of Commissioners, et.al., Case No. 23-008549-CZ,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Proposed Order Submitted for Entry from February 29, 2024 Hearing held in State-Court Action
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
27 27 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/05 8:33 PM
RESPONSE to21 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Robert Davis [E-filer]. (Davis [E-filer], Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Amended Complaint State-Court Action Davis v Wayne County Board of Commissioners, et.al., Case No. 23-008549-CZ,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Proposed Order Submitted for Entry from February 29, 2024 Hearing held in State-Court Action
Monday, March 04, 2024
26 26 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/04 4:48 PM
RESPONSE to25 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12 (b)(6) filed by Robert Davis [E-filer]. (Davis [E-filer], Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
25 25 motion Dismiss Thu 02/29 3:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12 (b)(6) by Donn Fresard. (Rajt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Gardner v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
24 24 notice Appearance Thu 02/29 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Rajt on behalf of Donn Fresard. (Rajt, Mark)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/29 8:03 AM
RESPONSE to16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Davis [E-filer]. (Davis [E-filer], Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits for Plaintiff Davis' Response in Opposition to Defendants Timothy Johnson's and Gaukler Pointe Communications' Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A- December 21, 2023 Stipulated Order Dismissing "Without" Prejudice State-law Tort Claims against Defendants Timothy Johnson and Gaukler Pointe Communications
Friday, February 23, 2024
22 22 motion Bond Fri 02/23 2:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Bond and for Injunction Against Further Litigation by Alisha Bell, Clark Hill, PLC, Martha G. Scott, Wayne, County of. (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-Motion w/o Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3-Sanctions Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4-Fees Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5-Order Re Leave,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6-Bureau of Election Filings - 3/20/23,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7-Bureau of Election Filings - 4/6/23,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8-Hearing Transcript,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9-Zimmer Email,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10-Proposed Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11-Zimmer Email,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12-Scott Affidavit,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13-Free Press Article,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14-Davis FOIA Chart,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15-Davis Lawsuit Chart,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16-Davis Email to F. Johnson,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17-Email Re Sallan Lawsuit,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18-Davis II Opinion and Order,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19-Email Adding Helmkamp,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20-First Helmkamp FOIA Request,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21-Second Helmkamp FOIA Request,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22-Third Helmkamp FOIA Request,
Att: 24 Exhibit 23-Appearances,
Att: 25 Exhibit 24-First Clark Hill FOIA Request,
Att: 26 Exhibit 25-Second and Third Clark Hill FOIA Requests,
Att: 27 Exhibit 26-Paterson Service Email,
Att: 28 Exhibit 27-Fourth Clark Hill FOIA Request,
Att: 29 Exhibit 28-Fifth Clark Hill FOIA Request,
Att: 30 Exhibit 29-FOIA Request Post-Davis I,
Att: 31 Exhibit 30-First FOIA Request Post-WCBC Meeting,
Att: 32 Exhibit 31-Second FOIA Request Post-WCBC Meeting,
Att: 33 Exhibit 32-FOIA Responses Post-WCBC Meeting,
Att: 34 Exhibit 33-Davis VII Complaint,
Att: 35 Exhibit 34-Historical Lawsuit Chart,
Att: 36 Exhibit 35-Restitution Report,
Att: 37 Exhibit 36-Cost Chart,
Att: 38 Exhibit 37-2010 Bond Order,
Att: 39 Exhibit 38-Motion Re Bond,
Att: 40 Exhibit 39-Davis Response to Motion,
Att: 41 Exhibit 40-Appeal Re Judge Hathaway Case,
Att: 42 Exhibit 41-Articles of Incorporation,
Att: 43 Exhibit 42-Colombo Dismissal,
Att: 44 Exhibit 43-Sapala Dismissal,
Att: 45 Exhibit 44-Levy Dismissal,
Att: 46 Exhibit 45-Transcript Re Order,
Att: 47 Exhibit 46-Bankruptcy Records,
Att: 48 Exhibit 47-Settlement Agreement,
Att: 49 Exhibit 48-Jamo Sanctions,
Att: 50 Exhibit 49-Bankruptcy Records,
Att: 51 Exhibit 50-Court of Appeals Decision,
Att: 52 Exhibit 51-Bell Affidavit,
Att: 53 Exhibit 52-Helmkamp Affidavit,
Att: 54 Exhibit 53-Griffie Affidavit
Thursday, February 22, 2024
21 21 motion Dismiss Thu 02/22 2:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Clark Hill, PLC. (Shekell, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Unpublished Cases
20 20 notice Appearance Thu 02/22 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Shekell on behalf of Clark Hill, PLC. (Shekell, Brian)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Thu 02/22 12:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Wayne, County of. (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Cases,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Home Rule Charter for County of Wayne,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Wayne County Commission Rule of Procedure
Monday, February 19, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss Mon 02/19 5:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Alisha Bell, Martha G. Scott. (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 2021 Davis Contract,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 2022 Davis Contract,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 Original Lawsuit in Davis II,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 Amended Complaint in Davis II,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 Opinion and Order in Davis II,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 Gaukler Stipulation in Davis II,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 Unpublished Cases,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 Case Dockets
17 17 trial Exhibit Index Mon 02/19 5:15 PM
INDEX of Exhibits re1 Complaint by Robert Davis [E-filer] (Davis [E-filer], Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit H,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit I,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit J,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit K,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit L
16 16 motion Dismiss Mon 02/19 3:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Gaulker Pointe Communications, LLC, Timothy Johnson. (Barron, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Appearance Mon 02/19 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne V. Barron on behalf of Gaulker Pointe Communications, LLC, Timothy Johnson. (Barron, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Appearance Mon 02/19 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent C. Sallan on behalf of Alisha Bell, Martha G. Scott, Wayne, County of. (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Appearance Mon 02/19 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Trebilcock on behalf of Alisha Bell, Martha G. Scott, Wayne, County of. (Trebilcock, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
12 12 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/16 7:34 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Donn Fresard served on 2/10/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Davis [E-filer], Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
11 11 notice Appearance Thu 02/15 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen H. Klaus on behalf of Clark Hill, PLC. (Klaus, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appearance Thu 02/15 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Rajt, Jr on behalf of Donn Fresard. (Rajt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
misc Pro Se E-filing Access Given Wed 02/07 11:49 AM
Pro Se E-filing Access Given to Robert Davis [E-filer]. (TTho)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
9 9 misc Pro Se E-Filer Electronic Account Renewal Wed 02/07 11:48 AM
Pro Se E-filer Electronic Account Renewal Form submitted by Robert Davis [E-filer] (TTho)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion - Free Mon 02/05 3:46 PM
ORDER Denying4 Motion for an Order Authorizing Plaintiff to File Pro Se Documents Electronically. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 02/05 3:48 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re8 Order on Motion, mailed to Robert Davis, at 180 Eason, Highland Park, MI 48203 (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/01 11:40 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Clark Hill, PLC served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024; Gaulker Pointe Communications, LLC served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024; Timothy Johnson served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024; Wayne, County of served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024. (DPer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation,
Att: 2 Document Continuation,
Att: 3 Document Continuation
Monday, January 29, 2024
6 6 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Mon 01/29 11:30 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued* Mon 01/29 8:09 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion - Free Fri 01/26 11:58 AM
MOTION for an order authorizing plaintiff to file documents electronically through the Court's ECF filing system as a pro-se litigant for this case only by Robert Davis. (DPer)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Filing Fee Not Paid* Fri 01/26 8:42 AM
Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 2/9/2024 (DPer)
Related: [-]
misc Fee Received Fri 01/26 2:36 PM
FILING FEE Received in the amount of 405.00 by All Plaintiffs - Receipt No. 150008910 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (Grew, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 01/26 8:38 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Robert Davis against defendants (DPer)
Related: [-]