Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 4:24-cv-00027
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Integrity Lending Services, Inc.
Represented By
Roy Edward Manoll, III
Fortson Bentley & Griffin, P.A.
contact info
Kelly Blair Etchells
Fortson, Bentley And Griffin, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Greg Irvin
Represented By
Roy Edward Manoll, III
Fortson Bentley & Griffin, P.A.
contact info
Kelly Blair Etchells
Fortson, Bentley And Griffin, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Check Into Cash, Inc.
Represented By
Lawrence B. Hancock
Holland & Knight, Llp - Houston
contact info
Brian Braine Sperry
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
L. Hancock
Holland & Knight, Llp - Houston
contact info
Peter Nathaniel Hall
Holland & Knight-Atlanta
contact info
Plaintiff
Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC
Represented By
Lawrence B. Hancock
Holland & Knight, Llp - Houston
contact info
Brian Braine Sperry
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
L. Hancock
Holland & Knight, Llp - Houston
contact info
Peter Nathaniel Hall
Holland & Knight-Atlanta
contact info
Plaintiff
TitleMax of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By
Lawrence B. Hancock
Holland & Knight, Llp - Houston
contact info
Brian Braine Sperry
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
L. Hancock
Holland & Knight, Llp - Houston
contact info
Peter Nathaniel Hall
Holland & Knight-Atlanta
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
35 35 misc A.O. Form 120 Tue 12/31 9:12 AM
AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
34 34 order Judgment - Consent Permanent Injunction Tue 12/31 9:06 AM
STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR A PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS: A Stipulated Judgment in the amount of $90,000 is entered in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendants, and each of them, as satisfaction for all claims for monetary damages in the Complaint. Defendants are jointly and severally liable for the monetary judgment in the amount of $90,000. Defendants are permanently enjoined and prohibited from making any commercial use of CIC trade names, logos, trademarks, and service marks, including, but not limited to, (a) CIC's Registered Trademarks numbered 85,671,458; 77,554,390; 77,226,790; 77,226,664; and 75,403,081 (collectively, the "Marks"); (b) CIC names or logos, or derivations thereof, on social media, in emails, email addresses, or other contact information; (c) any signage or advertising related to Defendants' products or services, including the exterior signs that were in place when Defendants took control of the properties; and (d) any internet use. See document for further specifics. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/30/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
33 33 misc Stipulation Mon 12/23 1:00 PM
STIPULATION of Judgment for Plaintiffs and for a Permanent Injunction by Check Into Cash, Inc., Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC, TitleMax of Georgia, Inc.. (Sperry, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
32 32 misc A.O. Form 120 Thu 11/14 8:51 AM
AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/14 8:40 AM
ORDER: Parties have filed a Notice of Settlement [Doc30 ]. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The parties shall file a dismissal or other filing disposing of this case upon finalization of the settlement. If settlement negotiations fail, or the Court's intervention is needed to enforce the settlement, the parties may move to reopen the case. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/13/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 11/13 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement in Principle by Check Into Cash, Inc., Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC, TitleMax of Georgia, Inc. (Sperry, Brian)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 11/14 8:45 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
29 29 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Thu 10/03 11:41 AM
SECOND STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING ARBITRATION-FILING DATE: Plaintiffs and Defendants stipulate that Plaintiffs' deadline to commence any arbitration by filing a demand with JAMS is extended to 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/3/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
28 28 misc Proposed Consent Order Wed 10/02 12:26 PM
Proposed CONSENT ORDER Second Stipulated Extension of Arbitration Deadline re:25 Preliminary Injunction,,, Case Stayed,,. (Sperry, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 09/17 8:30 AM
Submission of27 Order, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
27 27 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 05/28 9:42 AM
ORDER Extending Arbitration Filed Date to 90 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/28/2024. (dob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
26 26 misc Proposed Consent Order Thu 05/23 11:48 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Stipulated Extension of Arbitration Deadline. (Hall, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
25 25 order Preliminary Injunction ~Util - Case Stayed Mon 04/22 10:08 AM
STIPULATED ORDER FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND STAY PENDING ARBITRATION: Plaintiffs Check into Cash, Inc. ("CIC"), Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC ("CIC-GA"), and TitleMax of Georgia, Inc. ("TitleMax GA") (collectively "Plaintiffs") and Defendants Integrity Lending Services, Inc. f/k/a Flash Lending, Inc. ("Flash Cash") and Greg Irvin (collectively "Defendants") stipulate to the following Order for a Preliminary Injunction and Stay Pending Arbitration: See document for specifics. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/20/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
24 24 misc Proposed Order Fri 04/19 11:52 AM
PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Order for a Preliminary Injunction and Stay Pending Arbitration. (Hall, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
23 23 motion Dismiss Stay Compel Mon 04/08 9:45 AM
MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Compel Motion to Dismiss or Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration by Integrity Lending Services, Inc., Greg Irvin. (Manoll, Roy) . Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Compel on 4/8/2024 (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Mon 04/08 4:35 PM
Notification of Docket Correction re23 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Compel Motion to Dismiss or Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration by Integrity Lending Services, Inc., Greg Irvin. (Manoll, Roy). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Compel on 4/8/2024 (tmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Tue 03/26 11:27 AM
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - time change only: Notice is hereby given that the Court moves the hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction in this case for Thursday, April 25, 2024 from 1:30 p.m. to NOW TAKE PLACE AT 9:30 A.M. before the Honorable William M. Ray, II. The hearing will take place in Courtroom 353 of the United States Courthouse located at 600 East First Street, Rome, Georgia 30161. Each side shall submit prior to the start of the hearing, a proposed order which includes findings of fact and conclusions of law for each motion being heard. Orders should be submitted by email to: See document. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/26/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/07 4:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC, Check Into Cash, Inc., TitleMax of Georgia, Inc.. Integrity Lending Services, Inc. waiver mailed on 2/7/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Sperry, Brian)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/07 4:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC, Check Into Cash, Inc., TitleMax of Georgia, Inc.. Greg Irvin waiver mailed on 2/7/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Sperry, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
19 19 misc Affidavit Mon 02/05 3:19 PM
AFFIDAVIT re15 Order on Motion for TRO, Declaration of Greg Irvin by Integrity Lending Services, Inc., Greg Irvin. (Manoll, Roy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
18 18 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/02 3:59 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Integrity Lending Services, Inc., Greg Irvin. (Manoll, Roy)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/02 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Blair Etchells on behalf of Integrity Lending Services, Inc., Greg Irvin (Etchells, Kelly)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 02/02 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING: Notice is hereby given that the Court sets a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction in this case for Thursday, April 25, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. before the Honorable William M. Ray, II. The hearing will take place in Courtroom 353 of the United States Courthouse located at 600 East First Street, Rome, Georgia 30161. See document for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/2/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
15 15 5 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Fri 02/02 12:28 PM
STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: See document for specifics. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/2/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
14 14 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/31 2:38 PM
ORDER granting10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It appearing to the Court that the requirements stated in LR 83.1(B) for admission pro hac vice have been satisfied, the application of Lawrence B Hancock to appear pro hac vice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia in the subject case is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/31/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tmf)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 01/31 11:45 AM
Joint MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Stipulated) by Check Into Cash, Inc., Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC, TitleMax of Georgia, Inc..(Hall, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated TRO
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/31 8:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roy Edward Manoll, III on behalf of Integrity Lending Services, Inc., Greg Irvin (Manoll, Roy)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 01/31 10:14 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:10 APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence B. Hancock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13188212). Attorney Lawrence B. Hancock added appearing on behalf of Check Into Cash, Inc., Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC, TitleMax of Georgia, Inc.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
utility Refund Request Processed Wed 01/31 11:45 AM
Refund in the amount of $100.00 has been processed, effective 1/31/2024 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/31 2:40 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Lawrence B. Hancock re14 Order on Application for Admission PHV,,. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
misc Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online Tue 01/30 2:23 PM
Clerks Approval re11 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
11 11 misc Application for Refund of Fees paid online Mon 01/29 4:26 PM
Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 13187980. (Hall, Peter)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/29 4:09 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence B. Hancock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13188212). with Brief In Support by Check Into Cash, Inc., Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC, TitleMax of Georgia, Inc..(Hall, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
9 9 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Mon 01/29 3:14 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Notice is hereby given that the Court sets a hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [Doc2 ] in this case for Wednesday, January 31, 2024 at 12:30 p.m. before the Honorable William M. Ray, II. The Court will hear no evidence at the hearing, just argument. Plaintiffs must provide Defendants with actual notice of the hearing. Additionally, while the case is a Rome Division case, the hearing will take place in Atlanta in Courtroom 1705 of the Richard B. Russell Federal Building located at 2211 United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia 30303-3309. Each side shall submit prior to the start of the hearing, a proposed order which includes findings of fact and conclusions of law for each motion being heard. Orders should be submitted by email to: sherri_lundy@gand.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/29/2024. (tmf)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc A.O. Form 120 Mon 01/29 10:22 AM
AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/26 11:49 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Check Into Cash, Inc., Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CreditCorp Inc. for Check Into Cash, Inc., Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC. (Hall, Peter)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/26 11:47 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by TitleMax of Georgia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TMX Finance LLC for TitleMax of Georgia, Inc.. (Hall, Peter)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 01/26 10:50 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to L. Hancock. Clerk to follow-up by 2/5/2024. (djs)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc AO 120 Fri 01/26 10:06 AM
PROPOSED AO 120 for CIC . (Sperry, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 01/26 9:59 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Integrity Lending Services, Inc., Greg Irvin.(tmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Irvin
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 01/26 9:53 AM
Submission of2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (tmf)
Related: [-]
notice AO Form 120 - Notice to Parties Fri 01/26 9:59 AM
Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120 , located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Fri 01/26 9:53 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Check Into Cash, Inc., Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC, TitleMax of Georgia, Inc..(tmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - TRO,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - TRO,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - TRO,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - TRO,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - TRO,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - TRO,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - TRO,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - TRO,
Att: 10 Exhibit I - TRO,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - TRO
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/26 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Check into Cash of Georgia, LLC, Check Into Cash, Inc., TitleMax of Georgia, Inc.. (Filing fee $405, receipt number BGANDC-13182359)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet