New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis A Kaplan
Referred: Katharine H Parker
Case #: 1:24-cv-00611
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
55 55 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/01 9:13 AM
ORDER granting54 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Plaintiff's Letter Motion is GRANTED. The parties are reminded that they must state the reason(s) for their request in future letter motions. SO ORDERED.( Responses due by 5/15/2025 Replies due by 6/5/2025.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/30/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
54 54 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/29 8:26 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Damian Milhouse dated April 29, 2025. Document filed by Damian Milhouse..(Mortazavi, Sayed)
Related: [-]