Original Case: 1:18-cv-01048

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv.pr-01094
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 01, 2024 11:41 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
NESTLE DREYER'S ICE CREAM COMPANY
Represented By
Brooks R. Amiot
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Justin Clark Eller
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Charles Joseph Kresslein
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KELLI QUINN, Supervisor
Defendant - Appellee
CAITLIN BERMAN, HR Generalist
Defendant - Appellee
LANIK MCINTYRE, Human Resources Manager
Defendant - Appellee
BILL WOODS, Plant Manager
Defendant - Appellee
TERRENCE MURRAY
Defendant - Appellee
LISA NEASOM
Defendant - Appellee
LINDA HASTIE
Defendant - Appellee
DAVE BARBOUR
Plaintiff - Appellant
PHILLIP O'BRIANT
Represented By
Phillip O'Briant
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2024
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion--denying motion to dismiss appeal [1001530548-2]. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01048-ELH. Copies to all parties and the district court. Mailed to: Phillip O'Briant. [1001543937] [24-1094]

Docket last updated: 04/01/2024 6:34 AM EDT
Friday, January 26, 2024
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01048-ELH. Case manager: JeffNeal. [1001510642] 24-1094 JSN [Entered: 01/26/2024 01:07 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. [1001510648] Informal Opening Brief due 02/20/2024. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. Mailed to: Phillip O'Briant. 24-1094 JSN [Entered: 01/26/2024 01:11 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001510653]. Due: 02/09/2024. 24-1094 JSN [Entered: 01/26/2024 01:12 PM]
Related: [-]