Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Charles Eskridge
Case #: 4:24-cv-00327
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Terminated:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2024 3:39 AM CDT
Conflict Check Party
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
Conflict Check Party
Sabrina Demetro
Conflict Check Party
Swiss Reinsurance Ltd.
Defendant
Sabrina Mitlo
Defendant
Shasha White
Plaintiff
Lumico Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Sara E. Inman
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/29/2024 11:50 AM CST
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-31115362) filed by Lumico Life Insurance Company.(Inman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhs A-B
2 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sabrina Mitlo, Shasha White, filed.(Inman, Sara)
Related: [-]
3 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lumico Life Insurance Company, filed.(Inman, Sara)
Related: [-]
4 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Shasha White, filed.(Inman, Sara)
Related: [-]