Utah District Court
Judge:Tena Campbell
Referred: Daphne A Oberg
Case #: 1:24-cv-00013
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 4:37 AM MDT
Defendant
Patriot Pointe LLC
a corporation 111 E 2250 N
NORTH OGDEN, UT 84414
Represented By
Brian Scott Welker
contact info
Defendant
Tec Management LLC
a corporation PO BOX 1430
LAYTON, UT 84041
Represented By
Brian Scott Welker
contact info
Anna Nelson
Morgan Minnock Rice & Miner
contact info
Plaintiff
Faith Edwards
Represented By
Jared M. Allebest
Allebest Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, January 10, 2025
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 01/10 3:02 PM
ORDER granting 30 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with prejudice - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 1/10/25 (alt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Thu 01/09 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Patriot Pointe LLC. (alf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
30 30 motion Dismiss Wed 01/08 5:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Patriot Pointe LLC.(Welker, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion
Thursday, June 13, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Thu 06/13 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Anna Nelson filed by Anna Nelson on behalf of Tec Management LLC (Nelson, Anna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/12 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Scott Welker on behalf of Patriot Pointe LLC, Tec Management LLC (Welker, Brian)
Related: [-]
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/12 5:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Patriot Pointe LLC, Tec Management LLC. Attorney Brian Scott Welker added to party Patriot Pointe LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Scott Welker added to party Tec Management LLC(pty:dft)(Welker, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
26 26 3 pgs order Order Tue 06/11 5:55 PM
DISCOVERY MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/11/24 (alt)
Related: [-]
25 25 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Tue 06/11 5:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting 23 Motion for Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 9/6/24 for plas, 9/13/2024 for dfts. Expert Discovery due by 8/20/2025. Motions due by 9/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/11/24 (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
24 24 misc Attorney Planning Meeting Mon 06/10 5:33 PM
REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING.(Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Supplement
23 23 motion Scheduling Order Mon 06/10 5:30 PM
MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Faith Edwards. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Supplement
Friday, June 07, 2024
order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Fri 06/07 11:40 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice 20 Motion for Scheduling Order. This parties' submission does not comply with paragraph 3 of the 13 Order to Propose Schedule, which requires parties who agree on all issues to (1) file a stipulated motion for scheduling order, (2) file a jointly signed attorney planning meeting report, and (3) email a Word version of the proposed scheduling order to chambers. The parties only filed a document captioned "Proposed Amended Scheduling Order," using an old version of the court's scheduling order form. They did not file a motion or attorney planning meeting report, and they did not email a proposed scheduling order to chambers. The parties are ordered to comply with the 13 Order to Propose Schedule by June 11, 2024. They must use the updated attorney planning meeting report and scheduling order forms available on the court's website at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/civil-case-scheduling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/7/2024. No attached document. (med)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
21 21 misc Status Report Thu 06/06 6:51 PM
STATUS REPORT by Faith Edwards. (Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Scheduling Order Thu 06/06 6:13 PM
MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Faith Edwards. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
order Order Mon 06/03 11:19 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The parties are ordered to comply with paragraph 3 of the 13 Order to Propose Schedule by June 6, 2024. Plaintiff must also file a status report regarding the status of service of Defendant Patriot Pointe LLC ( see Doc. No. 18) by June 6, 2024. If the parties do not comply, the court will set a hearing at which the parties will be required to explain their failure to comply with court orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/3/2024. No attached document.(med)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
order Order Thu 05/16 12:34 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The parties are ordered to comply with paragraph 3 of the 13 Order to Propose Schedule within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/16/2024. No attached document.(med)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 05/16 12:37 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is ordered to file a status report within fourteen days regarding the status of service of Defendant Patriot Pointe LLC and Plaintiff's intentions to proceed against this defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/16/2024. No attached document.(med)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
16 16 service Return of Service Thu 04/18 3:27 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE Unexecuted for Personal Service served on Tyler Jensen on 02/26/2024, filed by Plaintiff Faith Edwards. (Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Return of Service Thu 04/18 3:26 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal Service served on Genneva Blanchard on 02/27/2024, filed by Plaintiff Faith Edwards. (Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Return of Service Thu 04/18 3:24 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal served on Ken Crockett on 02/26/2024, filed by Plaintiff Faith Edwards. (Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
13 13 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Tue 04/09 1:21 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/9/24 (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/08 9:44 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Tec Management,LLC. Attorney Anna Nelson added to party Tec Management,LLC(pty:dft)(Nelson, Anna)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/08 11:05 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 4/8/24 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Mon 04/08 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed via CM-ECF to Plaintiff Faith Edwards, Defendant Tec Management,LLC. (alt)
Related: [-]
misc Modification of Docket Mon 04/08 11:23 AM
Modification of Docket. Corrections: Dft party names have had punctuation removed and background addresses updated to proper format. (alt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Thu 02/29 1:34 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Faith Edwards as to All Defendants. (Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/29 1:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faith Edwards. Summons on 02/27/2024. (Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/29 1:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faith Edwards. Summons on 2/26/2024. (Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 01/29 8:50 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Faith Edwards. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 2/20/2024. (sg)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re1 Complaint. Attorney selected the incorrect division when creating the case. Case 2:22-cv-00043 2:24-cv-00071 will be closed and all pleadings will be transferred to case 1:24-cv-00013. Case number will now read 1:24-cv-00013 please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg) Modified on 1/29/2024 (sg). Clerk entered incorrect case number to be closed. Text stricken and entered correct case number.
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 01/29 8:50 AM
Judge Tena Campbell added. Case number will now read 1:24-cv-00013-TC. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)
Related: [-]
notice Notice From the Court Mon 01/29 8:33 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT re1 Complaint. Attorney selected the incorrect division when creating the case. Case 2:22-cv-00043 2:24-cv-00071 will be closed and all pleadings will be transferred to case 1:24-cv-00013. Case number will now read 1:24-cv-00013 please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg) Modified on 1/29/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 27, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-4949567) filed by Faith Edwards. (Allebest, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet