Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01022
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Allgroup LLP
Represented By
Allgroup LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 motion Motion, Default Judgment Tue 05/06 2:51 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 6/2/2025, (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment
Att: 3 Certification of Service
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/24 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 04/21 1:02 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Allgroup LLP. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/15 11:08 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/20 1:50 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
3 3 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 10/02 12:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 02/14 11:11 AM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Allgroup LLP . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 02/14 10:40 AM
Request for a First Summons filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 01/30 5:23 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01022 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16497557. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 01/29 11:09 AM
Adversary case 24-01022 Complaint against Allgroup LLP (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A