Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01036
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Legal and General Assurance Ltd.
Represented By
Legal and General Assurance Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Kara E. Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 01/27 12:25 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1036 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
5 5 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 12/31 10:39 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/20 2:03 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
3 3 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 09/25 4:54 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 02/14 11:58 AM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Legal and General Assurance Ltd. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 01/29 11:47 AM
Adversary case 24-01036 Complaint against Legal and General Assurance Ltd. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 01/29 7:13 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01036 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16497391. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1