Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01058
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bridgemere Distribution Limited
Represented By
Bridgemere Distribution Limited
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 motion Motion, Default Judgment Tue 05/06 2:54 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 6/2/2025, (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment
Att: 3 Certification of Service
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/24 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 04/21 3:33 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Bridgemere Distribution Limited. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/15 11:09 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/20 1:52 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
3 3 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 10/02 12:47 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 02/14 2:45 PM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Bridgemere Distribution Limited . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 01/30 5:23 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01058 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16497557. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 01/29 12:17 PM
Adversary case 24-01058 Complaint against Bridgemere Distribution Limited (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A