Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01066
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Carolina Precision Plastics, L.L.C.
405 Commerce Place
Asheboro, NC 27203
Represented By
Carolina Precision Plastics, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
13 13 notice Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 05/08 4:22 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 27, 2025
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/27 10:44 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1066 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Thu 02/27 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 02/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Monday, February 24, 2025
11 11 misc PDF Notice Mon 02/24 4:14 PM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 order Judgment Mon 02/24 4:13 PM
Judgment signed on 2/24/2025. Judgment entered that the Plaintiff, Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust be awarded a default judgment against the Defendant, Carolina Precision Plastics, L.L.C. dba CPPGlobal, in a total judgment of $27,835.25. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 25,0019 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 order Motion, Default Judgment Thu 02/20 1:52 PM
Order signed on 2/19/2025 Granting Motion for Default Judgment Related [+]. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9013-3 Tue 02/18 4:18 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9013-3 Related [+] Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Certification of Service
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
7 7 motion Motion, Default Judgment Tue 01/14 10:11 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 2/12/2025, (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment
Att: 3 Certification of Service
Friday, November 08, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 11/09 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 11/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
5 5 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 11/06 3:11 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Carolina Precision Plastics, L.L.C. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 11/06 12:59 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Service
Friday, February 02, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/02 5:29 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 01/30 9:20 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 2/29/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 01/30 5:23 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01066 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16497557. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 01/29 12:44 PM
Adversary case 24-01066 Complaint against Carolina Precision Plastics, L.L.C. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A