Connecticut District Court
Judge:Michael P Shea
Referred: Robert M Spector
Case #: 3:24-cv-00112
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2024 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Five Churches Brewing LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Rye
Cantor Colburn Llp - Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Peter Lemnotis
Represented By
Michael J. Rye
Cantor Colburn Llp - Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Philip Lemnotis, CT
Represented By
Michael J. Rye
Cantor Colburn Llp - Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Five Churches by the Bay LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Rye
Cantor Colburn Llp - Htfd
contact info
Plaintiff
Ayman Kamel
Represented By
William E Bradley
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Eric Rigoli
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, July 11, 2024
25 25 utility Report on Patent/Trademark Form Fri 07/19 11:06 AM
AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order Thu 07/11 9:21 PM
ORDER. In light of the parties'23 joint stipulation of dismissal, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 7/11/2024. (Pierson, M)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 07/19 11:11 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/09 11:58 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Ayman Kamel v. Five Churches Brewing LLC et al. by Ayman Kamel. (Rigoli, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/21 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Rigoli on behalf of Ayman Kamel (Rigoli, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
21 21 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 05/24 5:11 PM
Disclosure Statement by Five Churches Brewing LLC, Five Churches by the Bay LLC, Peter Lemnotis, Philip Lemnotis. (Rye, Michael)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/24 1:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Five Churches Brewing LLC, Five Churches by the Bay LLC, Peter Lemnotis, Philip Lemnotis.(Rye, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/24 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Rye on behalf of Five Churches Brewing LLC, Five Churches by the Bay LLC, Peter Lemnotis, Philip Lemnotis (Rye, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 05/13 5:25 PM
ORDER. The17 consented-to motion for extension is GRANTED. The defendants shall file their responses to the plaintiff's1 complaint on or by May 24, 2024 . Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 5/13/2024. (Pierson, M)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 05/14 12:44 PM
Answer deadline updated for Five Churches Brewing LLC to 5/24/2024; Five Churches by the Bay LLC to 5/24/2024; Peter Lemnotis to 5/24/2024; Philip Lemnotis to 5/24/2024. (Johnson, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/10 12:21 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 24, 2024 Respond to Complaint1 Complaint, by Ayman Kamel. (Bradley, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/11 10:08 PM
ORDER. The15 consented-to motion for extension is GRANTED. The defendants shall file their responses to the plaintiff's1 complaint on or by May 12, 2024 . Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 4/11/2024. (Pierson, M)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 04/12 9:33 AM
Answer deadline updated for Five Churches Brewing LLC to 5/12/2024; Five Churches by the Bay LLC to 5/12/2024; Peter Lemnotis to 5/12/2024; Philip Lemnotis to 5/12/2024. (Johnson, D.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/10 2:43 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 12, 2024 Respond to Complaint1 Complaint, by Ayman Kamel. (Bradley, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/08 10:43 AM
ORDER. The plaintiff's counsel has filed a "stipulation" that purports to extend the time for the defendant to respond to the complaint. In this District, stipulations do not extend deadlines. The Court construes the13 stipulation as a consent motion for extension. That motion is DENIED without prejudice to refiling. Motions for extension of time must be supported by good cause, i.e., "a particularized showing that the time limitation in question cannot reasonably be met despite the diligence of the party seeking the extension." D. Conn. L.R. 7(b). The parties' "stipulation" does not set out good cause warranting an extension of the deadline. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 4/8/2024. (Pierson, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/05 4:35 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 12, 2024 File Answer1 Complaint, by Ayman Kamel. (Bradley, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/13 11:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Peter Lemnotis waiver sent on 2/12/2024, answer due 4/12/2024; Five Churches by the Bay LLC waiver sent on 2/12/2024, answer due 4/12/2024; Five Churches Brewing LLC waiver sent on 2/12/2024, answer due 4/12/2024; Philip Lemnotis waiver sent on 2/12/2024, answer due 4/12/2024 filed by Ayman Kamel. (Bradley, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
11 11 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 02/01 9:21 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Five Churches Brewing LLC, Five Churches by the Bay LLC, Peter Lemnotis, Philip Lemnotis* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William E Bradley* *Robinson & Cole LLP* *1201 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 820* *Washington, DC 20004*. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Electronic Service Documents Thu 02/01 9:19 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of6 Electronic Filing Order,1 Complaint, filed by Ayman Kamel, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,9 Report on Patent/Trademark Form,2 Notice of Appearance filed by Ayman Kamel,7 Standing Protective Order,3 Disclosure Statement filed by Ayman Kamel Signed by Clerk on 2/1/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
9 9 1 pgs utility Report on Patent/Trademark Form Thu 02/01 9:18 AM
AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
8 8 misc Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 02/01 8:44 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Thu 02/01 8:43 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 01/30/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Electronic Filing Order Thu 02/01 8:42 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 01/30/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Thu 02/01 8:41 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/30/2024. Discovery due by 7/31/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2024. Signed by Clerk on 01/30/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/30/24.(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 01/30 10:28 AM
Disclosure Statement by AYMAN KAMEL. (Bradley, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/30 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William E Bradley on behalf of AYMAN KAMEL (Bradley, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/30 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7630459.), filed by AYMAN KAMEL.(Bradley, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Civil Action Cover Sheet
service Request to Issue Summons Tue 01/30 10:36 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Bradley, William)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Tue 01/30 11:00 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/30/24.(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/30 11:24 AM
Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]