Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:24-cv-10228
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Terminated:May 06, 2024
Case in other court:Norfolk Superior Court, 2382CV01092
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2024 4:41 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Massachusetts Electric Company
Represented By
Patrick M. Curran, Jr.
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Andrea M. Sullivan
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Pro se litigant Daniel J Tutungian
61 N Main St
Bellingham, MA 02019
Defendant
Massachusetts Electric Company
Represented By
Patrick M. Curran, Jr.
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Andrea M. Sullivan
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Pro se litigant Daniel J Tutungian
61 N Main St
Bellingham, MA 02019

GPO Apr 09 2024
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.Accordingly, because ERISA completely preempts the claims in Count 4 of the complaint and the Safe Harbor Exception does not apply, this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over this dispute. Plaintiff's motion to remand is DENIED.So Ordered.(de Oliveira, Flaviana)
GPO May 06 2024
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.Accordingly, and for the foregoing reasons, plaintiff's motion to remand (Dkt. No. 26) is GRANTED.So Ordered. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, May 06, 2024
38 38 misc Case file sent Mon 05/06 12:03 PM
Case file sent to Norfolk County Superior Court. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion to Correct Mon 05/06 11:59 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered terminating as moot 34 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants Opposition; terminating as moot 19 First MOTION for Order to Order scheduling and case management conference; terminating as moot 29 MOTION to Correct 27 Order on Motion to Amend. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
36 36 1 pgs order Order of Remand to State Court Mon 05/06 11:54 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to Norfolk Superior Court. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
35 35 5 pgs order Memorandum & Order Mon 05/06 11:47 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Accordingly, and for the foregoing reasons, plaintiff's motion to remand (Dkt. No. 26 ) is GRANTED. So Ordered. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 05, 2024
34 34 motion Leave to File Document Sun 05/05 7:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs MOTION to Remand to State Court and Amend Complaint by Daniel J Tutungian.(Tutungian, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
33 33 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Fri 05/03 8:54 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
32 32 misc Statement of counsel Wed 05/01 5:22 PM
STATEMENT OF COUNSEL Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Massachusetts Electric Company.(Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order
Thursday, April 25, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Thu 04/25 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2024 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (In person only) before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Template Scheduling Order
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
30 30 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 04/24 12:32 PM
Opposition re26 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Amend Complaint filed by Massachusetts Electric Company. (Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
29 29 motion Correct Tue 04/23 7:13 AM
MOTION to Correct 27 Order on Motion to Amend,,, Telephone Conference,,, Terminate Hearings,,, Set Hearings,, AND SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Daniel J Tutungian.(Tutungian, Daniel)
Related: [-]
28 28 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/23 3:11 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT REMOVAL OF LINE 57 AND COUNT IV against Massachusetts Electric Company, filed by Daniel J Tutungian.(Tutungian, Daniel) (Main Document 28 replaced on 4/23/2024, detached from supporting documents.) (de Oliveira, Flaviana). Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2024: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z) (de Oliveira, Flaviana). Some exhibits restricted due to containing personal identifiers. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
27 27 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Order on Motion to Amend Mon 04/22 4:01 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Telephone Conference held on 4/22/2024; pltff present (pro se) posture/events of case addressed;26 Pltff's Motion to Amend Complaint granted; said motion as to remand remains pending; Telephone Conference set for 5/8/2024 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com)(Attorneys present: Curran, Jr. for the deft) (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
26 26 motion Amend Wed 04/10 12:57 AM
MOTION to Amend Complaint, Motion to Remand to State Court by Daniel J Tutungian.(Tutungian, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
25 25 5 pgs order Memorandum & Order Tue 04/09 12:38 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Accordingly, because ERISA completely preempts the claims in Count 4 of the complaint and the Safe Harbor Exception does not apply, this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over this dispute. Plaintiff's motion to remand is DENIED. So Ordered. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
24 24 respm Opposition to Motion Mon 04/08 12:18 PM
Opposition re19 First MOTION for Order to Order scheduling and case management conference filed by Massachusetts Electric Company. (Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
23 23 respoth Response - not related to a motion Thu 04/04 7:50 PM
Reply and Response by Daniel J Tutungian to13 Opposition to Motion,6 Memorandum of Law of reasons in support of his motion for remand . (Tutungian, Daniel)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/04 11:45 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/22/2024 03:00 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Thu 04/04 11:41 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting18 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Remand ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/03 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Sullivan on behalf of Massachusetts Electric Company (Sullivan, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 31, 2024
19 19 3 pgs motion Order Sun 03/31 11:59 PM
First MOTION for Order to Order scheduling and case management conference by Daniel J Tutungian.(Tutungian, Daniel)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Leave to File Document Sun 03/31 11:47 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Remand by Daniel J Tutungian.(Tutungian, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se Fri 03/01 11:36 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting12 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se. Pro se litigants must have an individual PACER account to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at [LINK:https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account] . Pro se e-filing account Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-se.htm] . If you already have a PACER account with E-Filing access as a pro se litigant, you do not need to register again. Please email contact@mad.uscourts.gov . (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
16 16 cmp Counterclaim Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 02/26 12:51 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND , COUNTERCLAIM against Daniel J Tutungian by Massachusetts Electric Company. (Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
15 15 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/16 4:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se filed by Massachusetts Electric Company. (Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
14 14 misc Affidavit Wed 02/14 4:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Suzette Moreau by Massachusetts Electric Company. (Curran, Patrick) (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/14/2024, detached from supporting document.) (de Oliveira, Flaviana). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2024: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 02/14 4:27 PM
Opposition re6 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM of Reasons in Support of his motion for remand filed by Massachusetts Electric Company. (Curran, Patrick) Modified on 2/14/2024: Docket text corrected to reflect correct entry being opposed. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
12 12 motion Leave to file electronically Pro Se Thu 02/08 12:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Daniel J Tutungian. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
11 11 respoth Response - not related to a motion Thu 02/08 12:54 PM
Plaintiff's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendant's9 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim by Daniel J Tutungian. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/06 11:19 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Massachusetts Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate National Grid USA, Other Affiliate National Grid North America Inc., Other Affiliate National Grid (US) Investments 4 Limited, Other Affiliate National Grid (US) Partner 1 Limited, Other Affiliate National Grid (US) Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate National Grid plc. for Massachusetts Electric Company, Massachusetts Electric Company.. (Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
9 9 cmp Counterclaim Answer to Complaint - after filing of Notice of Removal Mon 02/05 4:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Daniel J Tutungian by Massachusetts Electric Company. (Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
8 8 service Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2 Fri 02/02 3:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Massachusetts Electric Company re7 State Court Record . (Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Fri 02/02 12:55 PM
STATE COURT Record Massachusetts Electric Company summons served on 1/8/2024, answer due 1/29/2024.. (Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
6 6 9 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Wed 01/31 1:40 PM
Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM of Reasons in Support of his motion for remand by Daniel J Tutungian. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/31 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Tutungian. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
4 4 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Mon 01/29 4:06 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 01/29 4:02 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/29 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Curran, Jr on behalf of Massachusetts Electric Company (Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 01/29 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Massachusetts Electric Company ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10242590 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Curran, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Category Form