Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-10571

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:24-ap-01011
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bridge Funding Cap, LLC
538 13th Avenue Suite 324
Brooklyn, NY 11219
Represented By
Bridge Funding Cap, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MNS Funding LLC
5314 16th Avenue Suite 139
Brooklyn, NY 11204
Represented By
MNS Funding LLC
contact info
Defendant
Azzure Capital LLC
1820 Avenue M Suite 695
Brooklyn, NY 11230
Represented By
Azzure Capital LLC
contact info
Defendant
Marich Bein, LLC
Represented By
Marich Bein, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Diverse Capital LLC
Represented By
Diverse Capital LLC
contact info
Defendant
PECC Corp
Represented By
PECC Corp
contact info
Defendant
ProofPositive LLC
Represented By
ProofPositive LLC
contact info
Defendant
MC DVI Fund 1, LLC
Represented By
MC DVI Fund 1, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MC DVI Fund 2, LLC
Represented By
MC DVI Fund 2, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Debt Validation Fund II, LLC
Represented By
Debt Validation Fund II, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Venture Partners LLC
Represented By
Venture Partners LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 11 Trustee
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
Represented By
Tyler Powell
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays Wood LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
242 242 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/15 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/15/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 240 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
241 241 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 05/14 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 238 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
240 240 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Tue 05/13 1:30 PM
Order On Stipulation Between Plaintiff Trustee And Defendant Bridge Funding Cap, LLC d/b/a Fundura Capital Permitting Amendment Of Complaint. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Stipulation Is APPROVED For The Reasons Stated Herein. 2. The Trustee Will Have Thirty (30) Days From Entry Of This Order To File His Second Amended Complaint To Assert Additional Causes Of Action Against Bridge. Bridge Will Then Have Thirty (30) Days From The Date The Amended Complaint Is Filed To Answer Or Otherwise Respond. 3. The Reservation Of Rights In The Stipulation Is Acknowledged. 4. The Court Retains Jurisdiction To Interpret And Implement The Terms Of The Stipulation And This Order. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/13/2025 (NB8)
Related: [-] 239
Monday, May 12, 2025
239 239 5 pgs motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 05/12 1:39 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Bridge Funding Cap, LLC d/b/a Fundura Capital consenting to Amendment of Complaint; Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Powell, Tyler)
Related: [-]
238 238 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Mon 05/12 12:05 PM
Order On Stipulation By And Between Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack, Trustee Of The LPG Liquidation Trust, The Post-Confirmation Oversight Committee As Intervenor By Consent, And Defendant Azzure Capital, LLC Consenting To Amendment Of Complaint. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Stipulation Is APPROVED For The Reasons Stated Herein. 2. The Trustee Will Have (30) Days From The Entry Of This Order To File His Second Amended Complaint To Assert Additional Causes Of Action Against Azzure. Azzure Will Then Have Thirty (30) Days From The Date The Amended Complaint Is Filed To Answer Or Otherwise Respond. 3. The Reservation Of Rights In The Stipulation Is Acknowledged. 4. The Court Retains Jurisdiction To Interpret And Implement The Terms Of The Stipulation And This Order. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/12/2025 (NB8)
Related: [-] 237
Friday, May 09, 2025
237 237 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 05/09 3:06 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and the Post-Confirmation Oversight Committee and Azzure Capital, LLC consenting to Amendment of Complaint; Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Powell, Tyler)
Related: [-]