New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:24-cv-00530
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2024 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER CIARDIELLO
Represented By
MICHAEL K. CHONG
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Defendant
CMC TRUCK SERVICE, INC.,
Represented By
MICHAEL K. CHONG
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CARLOS HERNANDEZ
Represented By
ANDREW GLENN
Jaffe Glenn Law Group, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Friday, May 23, 2025
35 35 order Order Fri 05/23 8:40 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' May 22, 2025 letter setting forth three dates for a settlement conference. Unfortunately, the Court cannot accommodate any of those dates. Accordingly, not later than May 28, 2025, the parties shall indicate in a joint submission whether they can appear for a settlement conference on any of the following dates and times: June 9 (any time); June 10 (11:00 a.m.); June 25 (11:00 a.m.); June 30 (any time); July 1 (2:00 p.m.); or July 2 (2:00 p.m.). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/23/25. (tad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 22, 2025
34 34 misc Letter Thu 05/22 9:53 AM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
33 33 order Order Wed 05/21 6:51 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties were directed to file a joint letter by May 19, 2025, indicating three mutually-agreeable dates for an in-person settlement conference with the Undersigned to be held in advance of July 2, 2025. It appears that the parties have failed to do so. Accordingly, by the close of business on May 23, 2025, the parties shall file the joint letter proposing dates for a settlement conference as directed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/21/25. (tad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
32 32 order Order Wed 05/14 12:58 PM
TEXT ORDER: On or before May 19, 2025, the parties shall file a joint letter which indicates three mutually-agreeable dates for an in-person settlement conference with the Undersigned to be held in advance of July 2, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/14/25. (tad)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 05/19 7:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 5/14/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
31 31 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/01 11:25 AM
TEXT ORDER: Due to an emergent criminal matter, today's conference is adjourned to May 14, 2025 at 12:30 p.m. Counsel shall dial 1-855-244-8681 and enter 2302 026 0103# to join the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/1/25. (tad)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
30 30 order Order Mon 04/28 9:35 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Mr. Glenn's April 25th letter [D.E. 29]. The May 1st conference will proceed as scheduled, so that the parties and Court may discuss the parties' proposal and timing of the settlement conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/28/2025. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
29 29 misc Letter Fri 04/25 8:00 AM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
28 28 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/24 10:42 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/24/2025. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
27 27 misc Letter Fri 03/21 4:39 PM
Letter. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
26 26 order Order Thu 03/06 7:17 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' March 5, 2025 letter, D.E. 25. The telephone conference scheduled for March 7, 2025 is adjourned sine die. On or before March 21, 2025, the parties shall provide a joint status report, indicating their efforts and progress in fully resolving this matter. To the extent that letter contains any confidential information, the parties may email the letter to njdnef_hammer@njd.uscourts.gov. If the matter is not resolved, the parties shall provide the Court with a proposed schedule for completion of depositions and expert discovery, and shall propose a new date for a telephone conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/6/25. (tad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Wed 03/05 5:01 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
24 24 order Order Fri 01/10 8:58 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Mr. Glenn's January 8, 2025 letter [D.E. 23]. The parties' request to extend discovery for a period of 45 days is granted. All fact discovery will now be completed by March 1, 2025. The Court will hold a conference on March 7, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel and the parties will kindly dial 855-244-8681 and enter code 2302-026-0103 to join the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/10/2025. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
23 23 misc Letter Wed 01/08 11:20 AM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 11/25 3:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Settlement Conference held on 11/22/2024. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
22 22 order Order Thu 11/21 10:23 AM
TEXT ORDER: It does not appear that Defendants have communicated a counter-offer in response to the Plaintiff's settlement demand. In order to facilitate a productive and efficient settlement conference tomorrow, Defendants shall communicate a counter-offer to Plaintiff's counsel by the close of business today, and be prepared to so inform the Court of that amount at the beginning of the settlement conference tomorrow. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/21/2024. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/07 4:31 PM
LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's19 Letter request that the parties be permitted to file their Confidential Settlement Memorandum by 11/12/1024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/7/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
20 20 order Text Order Thu 11/07 4:20 PM
TEXT ORDER: In light of counsel's request19 , each party shall submit a hard copy confidential settlement memorandum to the Undersigned's chambers by 11/12/2024. The settlement memorandum may not exceed five (5) double-spaced pages, and any accompanying exhibits must be tabbed for ease of reference. Any video or audio files must be submitted via a USB. The USB must be clearly marked with the case name and docket number, and the identity of counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/7/2024. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Letter Thu 11/07 12:19 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Letter Thu 11/07 9:10 AM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
17 17 order Order Fri 11/01 6:18 AM
TEXT ORDER: At the request of Plaintiff's counsel, the deadline to submit settlement memos is extended to November 7, 2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/1/24. (tad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Thu 10/31 4:30 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/15 5:02 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/15/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 08/01 10:34 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 7/15/2024. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
14 14 order Order Thu 07/11 9:22 AM
TEXT ORDER: TIME CHANGE ONLY! The July 15, 2024 scheduling conference will now take place at 12:00 p.m. Counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter access code 1456817# to join the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/11/24. (tad)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
13 13 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 07/08 5:33 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by CARLOS HERNANDEZ.(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
12 12 order Text Order Tue 07/02 9:25 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 7/8/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/2/2024. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 05/21 2:06 PM
Reset Hearing: The Telephone Scheduling Conference on 7/15/2024 will be held at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. (Time Change Only) (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
11 11 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Thu 05/09 12:53 PM
Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/9/2023. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
10 10 order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 05/08 6:26 PM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 7/8/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/8/2024. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Order Wed 05/08 11:38 AM
Proposed Order Confidentiality Order by CHRISTOPHER CIARDIELLO, CMC TRUCK SERVICE, INC.,. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/22 2:41 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CHRISTOPHER CIARDIELLO, CMC TRUCK SERVICE, INC.,.(CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Wed 03/20 3:26 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/20/2024. (and, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 03/19 3:11 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER by CHRISTOPHER CIARDIELLO, CMC TRUCK SERVICE, INC.,. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 03/19 3:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMC TRUCK SERVICE, INC.,. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/19 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. CHONG on behalf of CHRISTOPHER CIARDIELLO, CMC TRUCK SERVICE, INC., (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/22 8:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER CIARDIELLO, CMC TRUCK SERVICE, INC.,, filed by CARLOS HERNANDEZ.(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/30 2:54 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHRISTOPHER CIARDIELLO, CMC TRUCK SERVICE, INC.,. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/30 10:52 AM
Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/29 4:48 PM
COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER CIARDIELLO, CMC TRUCK SERVICE, INC., ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15046852) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CARLOS HERNANDEZ.(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons