Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sara Darrow
Referred: Eric I Long
Case #: 2:24-cv-02025
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2024 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Christopher Cisco
305158 FORD Ford County Jail Inmate Mail/Parcels 235 N American St
Paxton, IL 60957
Plaintiff
Kelly Splant


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
22 22 misc Letter Wed 01/08 3:12 PM
Letter from Christopher Cisco (RES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 07/17 10:35 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/17/2024. Plaintiff's Motion20 seeking an extension to pay the court fees is DENIED. Plaintiff remains responsible for the full $405 filing fee, but the Court did not set a specific deadline to do so. Plaintiff is advised that failure to pay the fee may result in future sanctions, including, but not limited to, an order barring him from filing future lawsuits. (ANW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/11 10:16 AM
USCA ORDER IT IS ORDERED that the petition and motion are DENIED. An appeal is the appropriate mechanism to challenge any final order. Cisco is also reminded that a litigant with three strikes must prepay any necessary fees for an appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). See full written Order. (RES)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 06/03 4:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Court Fees by Defendant Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 6/17/2024 (JMB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 05/28 3:05 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 5/28/2024. Defendant, who sought removal of this case from state court and leave to proceed in forma pauperis, filed a motion18 seeking reconsideration of the Court's finding that the three strikes provision of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) precluded him from proceeding in forma pauperis because he did not show he was in imminent danger of serious physical harm. The Court considered and rejected this argument when it denied Plaintiffs previous motion to reconsider. See Text Order entered April 2, 2024. For the reasons stated therein, Plaintiffs motion18 is DENIED.(ANW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/16 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA by Christopher Cisco. USCA Case Number 24-1854 (RES)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
18 18 motion Reconsideration Fri 05/10 12:42 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration by Defendant Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 5/24/2024 (RES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
17 17 misc Judgment Thu 04/18 12:16 PM
JUDGMENT entered in a civil case (SAG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/16 8:13 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 4/16/2024. Defendant was ordered to pay the $405 notice of removal filing fee by April 9, 2024. He has failed to do so. Accordingly, the matter is REMANDED back to the Circuit Court of the Eleventh Judicial Circuit, Ford County, Illinois. This case is CLOSED.(SAG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 04/02 12:15 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 4/2/2024. Defendant's Motion for Wage Garnishment15 is DENIED. The Court does not garnish wages for payment of filing fees. Defendant has also filed a Motion to Reconsider16 . Defendant argues that he should not be subject to the three strikes rule because he filed a notice of removal and so did not "bring a civil action" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(g). However, filing a notice of removal triggers a civil action to be opened in the federal district court and requires an accompanying filing fee. Therefore, the Court finds that Sec. 1915(g) applies. Defendant also argues he should not be subject to the three-strikes rule because he is in imminent danger. However, the Court does not find that having an order of protection entered against Defendant could put him in imminent danger. Defendant's concerns that an order of protection being entered against him will result in the Plaintiff being able to avoid capture for her alleged crimes of child sacrifice does not make him in imminent danger either. Defendant's Motion to Reconsider16 is therefore DENIED. Defendant must pay the filing fee on or before April 9, 2024, or this case will be dismissed and remanded to the Circuit Court of the Eleventh Judicial Circuit, Ford County, Illinois. (SAG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
16 16 motion Reconsideration Mon 04/01 2:37 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration regarding13 Order issued on 3/19/2024 by Defendant Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 4/15/2024. (ED)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/01 2:36 PM
MOTION for Wage Garnishment to pay the Court Fees by Defendant Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 4/15/2024. (ED)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Mon 04/01 2:35 PM
Letter from Christopher Cisco. (ED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/19 8:13 AM
ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 3/19/2024. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED:1. Defendant's Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis9 is DENIED. Defendant is DIRECTED to pay the $405 filing fee in full within 21 days of this Order. If Defendant fails to pay the filing fee within 21 days, this case will be dismissed and remanded to the Circuit Court of the Eleventh Judicial Circuit, Ford County, Illinois. 2. Defendant's Motions10 and11 are DENIED. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
12 12 misc Exhibit Fri 02/16 1:05 PM
Exhibits regarding1 Notice of Removal by Christopher Cisco.(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/16 1:04 PM
MOTION to Correct the Court Docket by Defendant Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 3/1/2024(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/16 1:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Trust Fund Ledgers by Defendant Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 3/1/2024(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
9 9 motion Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/16 12:56 PM
PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Christopher Cisco.(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
8 8 misc Letter Fri 02/16 12:55 PM
Letter to the Clerk from Christopher Cisco (RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Thursday, February 08, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Fri 02/09 10:43 AM
Letter to the Clerk from Christopher Cisco (RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/09 10:42 AM
MOTION to Submit all Documents Served on Defendant/Plaintiff by Defendant Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 2/22/2024(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
5 5 misc Jury Demand Fri 02/09 10:39 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Christopher Cisco.(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
4 4 3 pgs misc Memorandum Fri 02/09 10:37 AM
DECLARATION in Support of1 Notice of Removal by Christopher Cisco.(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/09 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Christopher Cisco(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Case Opening Tue 01/30 11:35 AM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 322 16th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201.Merit Review Deadline set for 2/20/2024.(SAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/30 10:37 AM
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case and the corresponding hearings are reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow for further proceedings due to the nature of the case. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 1/30/2024. (SAG)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/30 10:39 AM
Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long no longer assigned to case. (SAG)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/30 11:40 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 1/30/2024. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Removal but has not paid the $405 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $405 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(SAG) Modified on 1/30/2024 (SAG)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 01/29 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ford County Circuit Court, case number 23-OP-81, filed by Christopher Cisco.(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover letter,
Att: 2 envelope