Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Referred: Shannon G Elkins
Case #: 0:24-cv-00224
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Defendant
Washington County, MN
Defendant
Zoom Inc.
Plaintiff
Shawn Clarke Spottswood

GPO Jun 17 2024
>4.The Clerk of Court be directed to send a certified copy of this Order to the Washington County District Court, Tenth Judicial District. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/17/2024.(TMA)ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION:ORDER: Plaintiffs Amended Complaint/Petition (Dkt. 11) is this actions operative pleading going forward.REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 1.The Amended Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent that it brings claims for injunctive relief.2.The remainder of this action be STAYED pending the final resolution of Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswoods Washington County state-court criminal proceedings challenged by the Amended Complaint.3.Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswood be ordered to inform the Court within 30 days after the Washington County state-court matter challenged by the Amended Complaint (including any appeals) concludes by filing an appropriate notice in this actions docket.
GPO Jul 11 2024
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 12 Report and Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The June 17, 2024 Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 12) is ACCEPTED. The Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 11) is DISMISSED WITHOUTPREJUDICE to the extent that it seeks claims for injunctive relief. The remainder of this action is STAYED pending the final resolution of Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswood's Washington County state court criminal proceedings challenged by the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswood is ordered to inform this Court within 30 days after the Washington County state court matter challenged by the Amended Complaint concludes (including any appeals) by filing an appropriate notice in this action's docket. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a certified copy of this Order to the Washington County District Court, Tenth Judicial District. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 7/11/2024. (DMD)
GPO Mar 26 2025
ORDER LIFTING STAY (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 3/26/2025. (CMP)
GPO Mar 26 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 11 Amended Complaint filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood, 1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 3/26/2025. (CMP)
GPO Apr 15 2025
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The March 26, 2025 Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 17) is ACCEPTED. Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswood's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 11) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). (See Order for Complete Details.) (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 4/15/2025. (DMD)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, December 06, 2024
misc Mail Returned Fri 12/06 4:50 PM
(Text-Only)15 Mail Returned as Return to Sender/Released . Mail sent to: Shawn Clarke Spottswood 15015 62nd St N P.O. Box 3801 Stillwater, MN 55082 No forwarding address available. Mail not re-sent. Attempts Made: Checked MN-DOC and BOP. According to the BOP Mr. Spottswood is not in BOP Custody as of 04/10/2015. (BTX)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
15 15 misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Tue 11/19 2:24 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Shawn Clarke Spottswood.(kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Envelope
Monday, September 30, 2024
14 14 notice Notice to Attorney - Case Reassigned to SGE Mon 09/30 12:58 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins, this case is reassigned to her. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-224 JWB/SGE . Please use this case number for all subsequent filings. Scheduling orders entered before this case was reassigned will remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. If a previously scheduled proceeding conflicts with an event already on Magistrate Judge Elkins' schedule, the parties will be contacted, and a new date will be scheduled. Magistrate Judge Elkins' [LINK:practice pointers] are available on the Court's website. Please contact Magistrate Judge Elkins' chambers, at 651-848-1210, for scheduling or other matters. (CLK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Thu 07/11 4:25 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for12 Report and Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The June 17, 2024 Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 12) is ACCEPTED. The Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 11) is DISMISSED WITHOUTPREJUDICE to the extent that it seeks claims for injunctive relief. The remainder of this action is STAYED pending the final resolution of Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswood's Washington County state court criminal proceedings challenged by the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswood is ordered to inform this Court within 30 days after the Washington County state court matter challenged by the Amended Complaint concludes (including any appeals) by filing an appropriate notice in this action's docket. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a certified copy of this Order to the Washington County District Court, Tenth Judicial District. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 7/11/2024. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
12 12 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 06/17 1:05 PM
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: ORDER: Plaintiffs Amended Complaint/Petition (Dkt. 11) is this actions operative pleading going forward. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 1.The Amended Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent that it brings claims for injunctive relief. 2.The remainder of this action be STAYED pending the final resolution of Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswoods Washington County state-court criminal proceedings challenged by the Amended Complaint. 3.Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswood be ordered to inform the Court within 30 days after the Washington County state-court matter challenged by the Amended Complaint (including any appeals) concludes by filing an appropriate notice in this actions docket. 4.The Clerk of Court be directed to send a certified copy of this Order to the Washington County District Court, Tenth Judicial District. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/17/2024.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
misc Mail Returned Tue 07/23 3:49 PM
(Text-Only)11 Mail Returned as Attempted Not Known . Mail sent to: Shawn Clarke Spottswood c/o Britani Danz 208 4th Street East, Apt. 103 Hasting, MN 55033 No forwarding address available. Mail not re-sent. (ACH) Document QC'd on 7/23/2024 (ACH)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
misc Mail Returned Tue 05/14 9:20 AM
(Text-Only)11 Mail Returned as Unclaimed/Unable to forward. . Mail sent to: Shawn Clarke Spottswood 109 N Shore Dr Waverly, MN 55390 Mail resent to: Shawn Clarke Spottswood C/O Britani Danz 208 4th Street East Apt. 103 Hasting, MN 55033 Address listed on the amended complaint (BTX) Modified text on 5/14/2024 (BTX)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/03 2:28 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Washington County, MN, Zoom Inc. filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood. No summons requested. (BTX)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, April 05, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs Fri 04/05 4:22 PM
ORDER granting3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs.See ORDER for further instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/5/2024. (TMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 03/18 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Shawn Clarke Spottswood.(BTX)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
misc Mail Returned Mon 03/18 4:38 PM
(Text-Only)8 ,7 Mail Returned as Return to Sender . Mail sent to: Shawn Clarke Spottswood #00008246 Washington County Jail 15015 62nd St N. P.O. Box 3801 Stillwater, MN 55082 Mail resent to: Shawn Clarke Spottswood #00008246 109 N Shore Dr Waverly, MN 55390 Notice of Change of Address (BTX)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/08 2:23 PM
NOTICE by Shawn Clarke Spottswood(BTX)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
7 7 misc Letter Fri 03/08 2:20 PM
LETTER from Shawn Clarke Spottswood.(BTX)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
6 6 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 02/21 10:26 AM
ORDER/NOTICE. The Court orders Spottswood to either (1) provide a certified copy of his prison trust-fund-account statement signed by an appropriate prison official, or (2) pay this actions filing fee. The Court orders the Clerk of Court to send Spottswood a copy of the template Certificate of Authorized Prison Official contained in this Districts template IFP application (i.e., page 6 of Form AO 239). To assist Spottswood with providing the proper information, the Court also orders the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to authorities at the Washington County Jail Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/21/2024.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
5 5 misc Letter Fri 02/16 2:42 PM
LETTER from Shawn Spottswood. (BTX) Modified text on 2/16/2024 (BTX)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/16 2:24 PM
NOTICE by Shawn Clarke Spottswood re3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood.(BTX)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
3 3 motion Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP) Fri 02/16 2:06 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood.(BTX) Modified text on 2/16/2024 (BTX)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, January 29, 2024
2 2 misc Letter from Clerk's Office re: No Fee or IFP enclosing AO 239 Mon 01/29 2:41 PM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Shawn Clarke Spottswood (jam)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Prisoner Complaint under 42 USC 1983 Mon 01/29 2:41 PM
42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against The State of MN Wash Co, Zoom filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Envelope