New York Southern District Court
Judge:John P Cronan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00636
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) FLSA: Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2024 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Chang Li Supermarket Inc
Represented By
Kevin K. Yam
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Vinay Patel
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Cathy Jiang
Represented By
Kevin K. Yam
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Vinay Patel
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Santos Cardoso
Represented By
Lina Stillman
Stillman Legal, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, November 07, 2024
28 28 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Thu 11/07 12:43 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that Plaintiff Santos Cardoso has agreed to arbitrate his claims against Defendants Chang Li Supermarket, Inc., and Cathy Jiang in individual arbitration in accordance with the parties' arbitration agreement, and the Complaint shall be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that facsimile and electronic signatures of this stipulation shall be deemed originals for all purposes. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/7/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
27 27 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 11/06 3:35 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang..(Yam, Kevin)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Status Report Wed 11/06 3:34 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang..(Yam, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation of Dismissal
25 25 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/06 10:40 AM
ORDER On August 12, 2024, the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint proposed pretrial order and all other required pretrial filings, including any motions in limine, in accordance with 7.B-C of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, by November 4, 2024. Dkt. 22. That deadline has passed, and the docket does not reflect any such filings. Accordingly, by November 8, 2024, it is ordered that either (1) the parties must file on ECF the filings described in the Order at Docket Number 22 or (2) each party must submit a letter, of no more than five pages, showing cause why sanctions should not be imposed in light of the parties' failure to comply with that Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/5/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
24 24 order Memo Endorsement Fri 09/06 3:44 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:23 Status Report, filed by Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang ENDORSEMENT A bench trial is scheduled to begin in this matter on December 2, 2024, on the issue of whether the parties entered into an agreement to arbitrate. The parties shall comply with the deadlines as set forth in the August 12, 2024 Order. Dkt. 22. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/6/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Tue 09/03 11:52 PM
STATUS REPORT. (Jointly Submitted by the Parties), confirming with the Court that the bench trial date of December 2, 2024, works for all parties and their respective witnesses Document filed by Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang..(Yam, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
22 22 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/12 12:21 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER A bench trial is scheduled to begin in this matter on the issue of whether the parties entered into an agreement to arbitrate on December 2, 2024. The parties must familiarize themselves with the Courts Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. The Parties shall file a joint status letter by September 3, 2024, confirming that this trial date works for all witnesses. The joint proposed pretrial order and all other required pretrial filings, including any motions in limine, shall be filed in accordance with 7.B-C of the Courts Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases is due November 4, 2024. Any opposition to a motion in limine and responsive pretrial memoranda of law shall be filed by November 11, 2024. The parties shall appear for a final pretrial conference on November 25, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12D of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The final pretrial conference must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The Parties shall submit thumb drives with electronic copies of all intended trial exhibits by November 27, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 11/4/2024., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/4/2024., Responses due by 11/11/2024, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/12/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
21 21 misc Status Report Thu 08/08 5:10 PM
STATUS REPORT. (Jointly Submitted by the Parties) Providing: (1) An Update on the Status of the Limited Discovery Ordered by the Court and (2) The Parties' Mutual Availability for the Summary Trial in Fall 2024 Document filed by Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang..(Yam, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
20 20 order Memo Endorsement Wed 05/08 12:26 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:19 Status Report, filed by Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang ENDORSEMENT The request for limited discovery as described herein is granted. The parties shall file a joint status update no later than August 8, 2024, and proposed in that update dates for a summary trial in fall 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 5/8/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Fri 05/03 11:54 PM
STATUS REPORT. (Jointly Submitted by the Parties), advising the Court of their joint request for a summary trial regarding whether there was an agreement to arbitrate, and request for limited discovery of 90 days through August 1, 2024 on the issue of whether there is an agreement to arbitrate Document filed by Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang..(Yam, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
minutes Status Conference Fri 04/19 11:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Cronan: Conference held on April 19, 2024. The Court held a status conference to discuss Defendants anticipated motion to compel arbitration. No later than May 3, 2024, the parties shall submit a joint status letter advising the Court of any request for a summary trial regarding whether there was an agreement to arbitrate, any need for limited discovery in connection with such request, and any other relevant updates. (Court reporter Nicole Kristoferson). (mhe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/18 8:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vinay Patel on behalf of Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang..(Patel, Vinay)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 04/08 5:23 PM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The request is granted. The conference is adjourned to Friday, April 19, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 4/19/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/8/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
16 16 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 04/03 5:22 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference From Plaintiff addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Plaintiff dated 4/3/24. Document filed by Santos Cardoso..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Wed 04/03 5:03 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Conference re:11 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) to Discuss Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration of Plaintiff Santos Cardoso's Claims and Dismiss This Action, Or Alternatively Stay This Action. The Court will hold a conference to discuss the Defendants' anticipated motion to compel arbitration, Dkt. 11, and the issues raised by Plaintiff in the instant response on Thursday, April 18, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12D of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the request pending at Docket Number 11. SO ORDERED Status Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John P. Cronan.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/3/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/27 4:08 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Plaintiff Cardoso dated 3/27/2024 re:11 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) to Discuss Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration of Plaintiff Santos Cardoso's Claims and Dismiss This Action, Or Alternatively Stay This Action; and to Prov . Document filed by Santos Cardoso..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
13 13 respoth Response (non-motion) Tue 03/26 8:50 PM
RESPONSE re: Set/Reset Deadlines,12 Order on Motion for Conference, . Document filed by Santos Cardoso..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
12 12 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Tue 03/26 3:40 PM
ORDER with respect to11 Letter Motion for Conference re:11 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) to Discuss Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration of Plaintiff Santos Cardoso's Claims and Dismiss This Action, Or Alternatively Stay This Action. Plaintiff shall respond to this letter by April 2, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/26/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/26 3:41 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/2/2024 (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
11 11 motion Conference Fri 03/15 2:42 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) to Discuss Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration of Plaintiff Santos Cardoso's Claims and Dismiss This Action, Or Alternatively Stay This Action; and to Provide the Court with the Parties' Proposed Briefing Schedule in Accordance with Judge Cronan's Individual Rules addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin K. Yam dated March 15, 2024. Document filed by Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang..(Yam, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Santos Cardoso's Signed Arbitration Agreement with Class/Collective Action Waiver
Sunday, February 25, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Sun 02/25 12:38 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Cathy Jiang served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/15/2024. Service was accepted by MATT -Co-worker). Document filed by Santos Cardoso..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Sun 02/25 12:36 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Chang Li Supermarket Inc served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/15/2024. Service was accepted by Chang Li Supermaket Inc --. Document filed by Santos Cardoso..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 02/20 1:42 PM
ORDER granting7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The request is granted. Defendants may respond to the Complaint by March 15, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 2/20/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/20 1:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Chang Li Supermarket Inc answer due 3/15/2024; Cathy Jiang answer due 3/15/2024. (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/16 4:28 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion, Answer, or Response to Plaintiff's Complaint [Dkt. 1] addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin K. Yam dated February 16, 2024. Document filed by Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang..(Yam, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/14 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin K. Yam on behalf of Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang..(Yam, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/31 4:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 01/30 11:25 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/30 11:16 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lina Stillman to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 01/30 11:20 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 01/30 11:21 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 01/30 11:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/29 7:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/29 7:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHANG LI SUPERMARKET INC., and CATHY JIANG,, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Santos Cardoso..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/29 7:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Chang Li Supermarket Inc, Cathy Jiang. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28875276)Document filed by Santos Cardoso..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]