Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Roy B Dalton, Jr
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:20-cv-00165
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2024 10:08 PM EST
Defendant
Airamid Health Services, LLC
Defendant
Select Rehabilitation, LLC
Movant
United States of America
Represented By
Katherine M. Ho
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
Robert Sowell
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Walston
Represented By
Robert Scott Oswald
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Janel Quinn
The Employment Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 22, 2024
43 43 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/22 2:18 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re 40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and 42 Notice of Consent. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/22/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/20 4:39 PM
NOTICE by United States of America of Consent to 40 Voluntary Dismissal (Sowell, Robert)
Related: [-]
41 41 2 pgs order Order directing compliance Tue 02/20 7:48 AM
It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that on or before February 27, 2024, the parties are each DIRECTED to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement and a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions to comply with the Court's Order (Doc. 39 ). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/17/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
40 40 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Tue 02/13 1:23 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Kimberly Walston (Oswald, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
39 39 13 pgs order Order Tue 01/30 3:01 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/30/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
38 38 3 pgs order Order to Unseal Case Mon 01/29 2:23 PM
It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to unseal the Complaint (Doc. 1 ), First Amended Complaint (Doc. 10 ), and the United States' Notice of Election to Decline Intervention (Doc. 37 ). All other contents of the Court's docket in this action filed before this Order shall remain under seal and are not to be made public or served on Defendants. Beginning with this Order, the seal is LIFTED as to all other matters occurring in this action from the date of this Order and thereafter. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/27/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
37 37 NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention by United States of America(AJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
35 35 MEMORANDUM of law in support re 34 Ex Parte Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by United States of America. (EAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
32 32 MEMORANDUM of law in support re 31 Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Intervention Period and Seal filed by United States of America. (AJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
29 29 MEMORANDUM in support re 28 Ex Parte Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by United States of America. (SRD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
27 27 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:20-cv-165-RBD-RMN. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. (RPB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
26 26 ORDER granting 25 Ex Parte Motion to Partially Lift the Seal. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/11/2023. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
25 25 Ex Parte MOTION to Partially Lift the Seal and Memorandum of Law in Support by United States of America.(LDJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Modified text on 1/9/2023 (LDJ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 14, 2022
23 23 MEMORANDUM of Law in support re 22 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Intervention Period and Seal filed by United States of America. (SPM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
21 21 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:20-cv-165-RBD-DAB. US Magistrate Judge Gregory J Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
18 18 MEMORANDUM of Law in support re 17 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Intervention Period and Seal filed by United States of America. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
15 15 MEMORANDUM of Law in support re 14 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Intervention Period and Seal filed by United States of America. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
12 12 MEMORANDUM of Law in support re 11 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Intervention Period and Seal filed by United States of America. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
10 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Airamid Health Services, LLC, Select Rehabilitation, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Kimberly Walston. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Kimberly Walston.(LDJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
8 8 MEMORANDUM of Law in support re 7 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Intervention Period and Seal filed by United States of America. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
5 5 MEMORANDUM of Law in support re 4 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Intervention Period and Seal filed by United States of America. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
3 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/3/2020. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
2 2 MOTION to Seal Case by Kimberly Walston. (LDJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Airamid Health Services, LLC, Select Rehabilitation, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ORL088625) filed by Kimberly Walston.(LDJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet