Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01089
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
N2O Ltd.
Represented By
N2O Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Kara E. Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 motion Motion, Default Judgment Tue 05/06 3:16 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 6/2/2025, (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment
Att: 3 Certification of Service
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 04/26 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 04/23 3:02 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against N2O Ltd. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/15 11:17 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/20 2:23 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
3 3 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 09/25 4:49 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Thursday, February 15, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 02/15 8:50 AM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against N2O Ltd. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 01/29 1:30 PM
Adversary case 24-01089 Complaint against N2O Ltd. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A