Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01102
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
One Roof Social
Represented By
One Roof Social
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Kara E. Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
10 10 motion Motion, Default Judgment Tue 05/06 3:18 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 6/2/2025, (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 8
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment
Att: 3 Certification of Service
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 04/26 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 04/23 3:03 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against One Roof Social, Ltd. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/15 11:18 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/20 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
5 5 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 09/25 5:08 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Monday, July 29, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Mon 07/29 2:33 PM
Amended Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against One Roof Social, Ltd. (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/29 1:17 PM
Amended Complaint against One Roof Social, Ltd. Related [+] Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, February 15, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 02/15 9:57 AM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against One Roof Social . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 01/29 1:49 PM
Adversary case 24-01102 Complaint against One Roof Social (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A