Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01122
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Derik Industrial USA, Inc.
980 Broadway Suite 605
Thornwood, NY 10594
Represented By
Derik Industrial USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, January 23, 2025
9 9 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 01/23 2:51 PM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 1/23/2025 Voluntarily Dismissing this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 01/23 1:20 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order for Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 01/23 2:51 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1122 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/25 12:56 PM
Certificate of Service - Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Derik Industrial USA, Inc.s, First Set of Request for Admissions filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/30 12:33 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
5 5 answer Statement Wed 05/29 2:04 PM
Statement -- Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7026 and Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Gilbert A. Lazarus on behalf of Derik Industrial USA, Inc.. (Lazarus, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
4 4 answer None Fri 04/26 10:09 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Gilbert A. Lazarus on behalf of Derik Industrial USA, Inc.. (Lazarus, Gilbert)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, February 02, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/02 5:41 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] ,1
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 01/30 9:20 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 2/29/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 01/30 5:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01122 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16499321. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 01/29 3:00 PM
Adversary case 24-01122 Complaint against Derik Industrial USA, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A