Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01194
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Takumi International Ltd
101 Avenue of the Americas 9th Fl
New York, NY 10013
Represented By
Takumi International Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Kara E. Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 motion Motion, Default Judgment Tue 05/06 3:37 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 6/2/2025, (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment
Att: 3 Certification of Service
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 04/26 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 04/23 3:26 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Takumi International Ltd Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/15 11:23 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
4 4 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 09/25 4:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Friday, February 02, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/02 3:00 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 01/30 9:20 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 2/29/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 01/29 6:12 PM
Adversary case 24-01194 Complaint against Takumi International Ltd (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A