Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust v. Tie Commerce, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-ap-01204 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 27, 2025 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Tie Commerce, Inc.
P.O. Box 412823
Boston, MA 02241 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/27 11:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1204 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Monday, January 06, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, November 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 11/15/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default against Tie Commerce, Inc. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 3/1/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 01/31 5:22 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01204 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16499539. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 24-01204 Complaint against Tie Commerce, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |