Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust v. Atlantic Coast Creations, Ltd.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-ap-01223 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Atlantic Coast Creations, Ltd.
1155 High Street
Central Falls, RI 02863 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 07/11 2:19 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1223 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Signed on 6/6/2024 Admitting Ryan F. Kelley to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() So Ordered Stipulation Signed on 6/4/2024 Extending Time for Filing Responsive Pleading to the Complaint, Initial Disclosures, and Serving Written Discovery. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading to the Complaint, Initial Disclosures, and Serving Written Discovery Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Ryan F. Kelley on behalf of Atlantic Coast Creations, Ltd.. (Kelley, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 05/28 3:54 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 24-01223 dsj] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16644081. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 3/1/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 01/31 5:24 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01223 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16499541. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 24-01223 Complaint against Atlantic Coast Creations, Ltd. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |