Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01233
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
IGH Talent Ltd.
Represented By
IGH Talent Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 motion Motion, Default Judgment Tue 05/06 3:05 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 6/2/2025, (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment
Att: 3 Certification of Service
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 04/26 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 04/23 1:31 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against IGH Talent Ltd. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/15 11:13 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/20 2:01 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
3 3 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 09/25 5:10 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 02/14 1:37 PM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against IGH Talent Ltd. (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 01/30 12:05 PM
Adversary case 24-01233 Complaint against IGH Talent Ltd. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 01/30 5:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01233 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16499321. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1